December 23, 2015 |
Filing
240
ORDER Granting 239 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees.IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants have no dismissed its Third Party Complaint filed against Third-Party Defendant Christopher E. Corson, on April 5, 2013, against whom a default was entered by the United States District Court Clerk on 3/27/14 117 . Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
December 9, 2015 |
Filing
238
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 12/21/15. Failure to timely comply will result in the imposition of sanctions up to and including a recommendation to the District Judge that the complaint be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
August 3, 2015 |
Filing
235
ORDER Denying 207 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 206 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is Denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 210 Defendants' Amended Renewed Motion to Exclude E xpert Testimony of Witness Ken Braustein is Denied, and 209 Defendants' Renewed Motion is Denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 233 Defendants' Motion to Strike is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
June 30, 2015 |
Filing
228
ORDER that 226 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply re 207 Motion for Summary Judgment, is granted. Plaintiffs shall file their Sur-Reply no later than July 7, 2015. Any response to the sur-reply by the Defendants shall be filed no later than July 14, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
April 2, 2015 |
Filing
222
ORDER granting 221 Stipulation to extend deadline for Defendants to reply to Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' motions. Responses to 206 due by 4/3/2015. Replies to 207 , 209 , and 210 due by 4/7/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
March 19, 2015 |
Filing
220
ORDER Granting 217 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) FOR DEFENDANTS TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS. Replies to 206 and 207 Motion for Summary Judgment, 209 Renewed Motion to Exclude Expert Witness and 210 Amended Renewed Motion to Exclude Expert Witness due by 4/3/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
212
ORDER granting 211 Stipulation to extend time to respond to 206 , 207 motions for summary judgment; 209 and 210 renewed motion to exclude Witness. Responses due by 3/9/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
September 17, 2014 |
Filing
199
ORDER re 198 Notice of Disassociation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall remove Mr. William D. Schuller, Esq. as counsel of record for Defendants Boyd Gaming Corporation and M.S.W., Inc., in CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
August 13, 2014 |
Filing
185
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 134 Motion to Compel, 142 Motion to Quash, 144 Motion to Strike/Exclude Ken Braunstein as Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, 146 Cross-Motion to Amend Discovery Plan, 148 Motion to Quash Subpo ena and for Protective Order Regarding Ken Braunstein, and 152 Motion for an Order Limiting Electronic Access to or Prohibiting Electronic Filin of Certain Specifically Identified Materials. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to compl ete the depositions of Dr. Leon Liem and Dr. Owen Nishikawa by October 8, 2014. The Court shall set a deadline for completing the depositions of the parties security expert witnesses once the parties determine what additional time is required for the experts to review records produced pursuant to Order (#184) and to supplement their opinions based thereon. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
July 8, 2014 |
Filing
180
ORDER Granting 179 Stipulation to move hearing date on all pending motions scheduled to be heard on 7/9/2014 to 8/8/2014 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
February 12, 2014 |
Filing
112
ORDER Denying 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Retransfer Venue and Granting 58 Defendants' Motion for District Judge to Reconsider, Rescind, or Modify Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 02/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
January 27, 2014 |
Filing
100
PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 98 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 01/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
July 5, 2013 |
Filing
73
ORDER Granting 69 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 58 Motion to Reconsider and Respond re 67 Motion to Transfer Venue. Responses due by 7/11/2013. Replies due by 7/11/2013. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 19, 2013 |
Filing
65
ORDER Granting 63 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Salvatore C. Gugino is substituted in place and stead of Randall K. Schmitt and Jesse John Thomas Smith for Boyd Gaming Corporation and M.S.W., Inc. d/b/a Main Street Station Casino, Brewery and Hotel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|