Estrada v. Gillespie et al

Defendant: Deputy Albright, Douglas Gillespie, Gabriel Munoz and Deputy Varner
Plaintiff: Gustavo C. Estrada
Case Number: 2:2013cv00280
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall show cause in writing no later than 9/3/2013 why sanctions should not be imposed for his failure to file a Certificate as to Interested Parties and his failure to comply with this court's 22 Order. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/19/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 18, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall detach the Certificate of Interested Parties attached to the 26 Motion as Exhibit A and file it in the courts record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 14, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 4 and 11 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 27, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 57 Notice re 4m Dismissal. The above-entitled action be, and hereby is, DISMISSED without prejudice only as to defendant Gravilovic. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
May 12, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada v. Gillespie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Gillespie
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Munoz
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo C. Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.