Town & Country Bank v. Katz et al

Plaintiff: Town & Country Bank
Defendant: Leon R Katz
Case Number: 2:2013cv00312
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on 17 Motion to Withdraw. IT IS ORDERED that a Motion Hearing re 17 Motion to Withdraw is set for 11/22/2013 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Responses due by 11/15/2013. The Court furt her orders Defendants counsel to serve this order on Defendants no later than 11/12/2013, and to file a proof of service with the Court no later than 11/13/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/08/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 3, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging 20 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/03/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 28, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Town & Country Bank and against Leon R Katz and the Katz Family Trust dated January 25, 1989, as amended and restated, in the amount of $801,476.68, plus interest from December 17, 2013 through the date of entr y of this judgment at $244.90 per diem, with post-judgment accruing at the default rate of 11% per annum from the date of entry of this judgment until it is paid in full. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 28, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 8 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order without prejudice. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town & Country Bank v. Katz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town & Country Bank
Represented By: Justin C. Jones
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon R Katz
Represented By: Joseph T Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.