June 9, 2015 |
Filing
87
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 85 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing
82
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Leslie Nachman. Intercellular and Regenocyte are liable for breach of their contract with Nachman and for damages in the amount of $49,950.00 All of the Defendants are liable to Nachman for his out of pocket damages arising from their fraudulent misrepresentations in the amount of $49,950.00. All Defendants are liable in the amount of $100,000.00 for punitive damages. Nachman is also entitled to interest and costs on these damages and may seek those costs pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
August 1, 2014 |
Filing
78
AMENDED ORDER Adopting and Accepting in full 75 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. FURTHER ORDERED that Default Judgment shall be entered against Defendants Intercellular Sciences, LLC and Michael Calcaterra. FURTHER ORDERED that Default Judgment shall be entered against Defendants Regenocyte Worldwide, Inc., Regenocyte, LLC, Regenocyte Therapeutic, LLC, and Dr. Zannos Grekos. Plaintiff is ordered to provide supplemental briefing on the issue of damages as to each Defendant, and to attach a proposed order to his brief. Plaintiff shall file his supplemental brief within thirty (30) days of the Order issued on July 29, 2014 (dkt. no. 76 ). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 30, 2014 |
Filing
77
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Leslie Nachman and against Defendants Intercellular Sciences, LLC, Michael Calcaterra, Regenocyte Worldwide, Inc., Regenocyte, LLC, Regenocyte Therapeutic, LLC, and Dr. Zannos Grekos. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 7/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
July 29, 2014 |
Filing
76
ORDER Adopting and Accepting in full Magistrate Judge Peggy Leen's 75 Report and Recommendation. The Answers of Defendants Intercellular Sciences, LLC and Michael Calcaterra shall be stricken and default judgment entered against them. Pl aintiff's 60 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Regenocyte Worldwide, Inc., Regenocyte, LLC, Regenocyte Therapeutic, LLC, and Dr. Zannos Grekos is Granted. Default Judgment shall be entered against Defendants Regenocyte Worldwi de, Inc., Regenocyte, LLC, Regenocyte Therapeutic, LLC, and Dr. Zannos Grekos. Plaintiff shall file a supplemental brief on the issues of damages as to each Defendant within 30 days of this Order and attach a proposed order to his brief. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 24, 2014 |
Filing
73
ORDER Granting 71 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Gabriel L. Grasso as to Defendant Intercellular Sciences, LLC. Defendant shall have until 4/21/2014 to retain new counsel. Failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation to the Dis trict Judge for sanctions, including case-dispositive sanctions. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy mailed to Defendant - SLD)
|
March 5, 2014 |
Filing
67
ORDER Granting 56 and 59 Plaintiff's Motions to Compel. Defendant shall have until 3/18/2014 in which to provide full and complete responses to the Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. The Court will assess monetary sanctions for the necessity of the motions to compel in favor of the Plaintiff against these Defendants, jointly and severally, in the amount of $2,025.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 03/05/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
February 14, 2014 |
Filing
62
ORDER that a Motion Hearing re 59 and 56 Motions to Compel is set for 3/4/2014 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 02/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
February 5, 2014 |
Filing
57
ORDER Denying Defendants' 23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Denying Defendants' 24 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
June 19, 2013 |
Filing
32
ORDER Granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Gabriel L Grasso withdrawn from the case as to Defendants Intercellular Sciences, LLC and Michael Calcaterra. Defendants Intercellular Sciences, LLC shall have until 7/19/2013, in which to reta in new counsel. Defendant Michael Calcaterra shall have until 7/19/2013 to either retain counsel or file a notice that he will appeal pro se. Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants at address listed in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: defendants as ordered - EDS)
|