Guerrero v. Williams et al

Petitioner: Pablo Ramon Guerrero
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian E. Williams
Case Number: 2:2013cv00328
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2018 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 87 respondents' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Guerrero has until 9/21/18, to inform the court of his option. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 15, 2018 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 93 Guerrero's motion to extend time is GRANTED nunc pro tunc, and 94 his motion for leave to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss out of time is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/15/2018, nunc pro tunc to 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 8, 2018 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 89 Motion to Extend Time re Re: 87 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/19/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 3, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 79 petitioner's motion to reopen this action is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, because the stay is lifted by this order, the Clerk is directed to REOPEN THE FILE in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents have until 9/15/17, toanswer the second-amended petition 26 . See Order for further deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 19, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 64 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pneding final resolution of petitioner's state postconviction proceedings. The clerk shall administratively close this action until it is reopened by timely motion after the issuance of the remittitur by the Supreme Court of Nevada. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 23, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that, within 30 days of entry of this order, Petitioner shall file a verification of the 26 Second Amended Petition. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that, within 60 days of entry of this order, Respondents shall respond by motion to dismiss. Petitioner shall have 30 days from service of the response to file an opposition. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 01/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 26, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 24 Motion to Extend Time to File a Second Amended Petition. Amended Petition due by 12/15/2013. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 5, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 22 Petitioner's Second Motion to Extend Time to File Second Amended Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion may be renewed within 90 days subject to the conditions outlined in this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 5, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall serve copies of 8 Order; 9 Amended Petition; and 15 Order on respondents. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents SHALL FILE a notice of appearance within ten (10) days of the date of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that the pa rties SHALL FILE such joint statement describing what portions of petitioners state court record have been obtained and what portions are missing within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 10 Motion for Leave and Extension of Time to File Second Amended Petition is GRANTED. Petitioner shall file his second amended petition within ninety (90) days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the FPD is released as counsel. FURTHER ORDERED that CJA Attorney Mario D Valencia is appointed to represent petitioner. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/12/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 1, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the clerk DETACH and FILE the petition (ECF #1-1.) FURTHER ORDERED that 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nevada is appointed to represent petitioner. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall ELECTRONICALLY SERVE the FPD a copy of this order, together with a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus. The FPD shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order to file a notice of appearance or to indicate tot he court its inability to represent petitioner in these proceedings. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 15, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the date this order is ENTERED in which to have the designated fee sent to the clerk. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action. The clerk is directed to RETAIN the petition but not file it at this time. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pablo Ramon Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?