World Chess Museum, Inc. v. World Chess Federation, Inc. et al

Defendant: Stan Vaughan and World Chess Federation, Inc.
Plaintiff: World Chess Museum, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00345
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of World Chess Museum, Inc. against World Chess Federation, Inc.. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 29, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 82 Motion for Entry of Default is granted. The Clerk of the Court is hereby instructed to enter default against Defendant World Chess Federation, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 20, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 75 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Airene Williamson withdrawn from the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve Defendant World Chess Federation, Inc., with a copy of this order at the defendant's last known address. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall add the last known address of Defendant World Chess Federation, Inc. to the civil docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant World Chess Federation, Inc. shall have until 6/22/15 to retain new counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 7, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 70 OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION re 69 Order on Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 21, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 27 Motion or Relief from the Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 15, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 12, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall file its Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than March 22, 2013. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Chess Museum, Inc. v. World Chess Federation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Chess Federation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Chess Museum, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Clark
Represented By: Philip R Erwin
Represented By: Matthew G. Minder
Represented By: J. Colby Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?