Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation v. King

Defendant: Tara King
Plaintiff: Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation
Case Number: 2:2013cv00352
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court enter JUDGMENT for Defendant and against Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other outstanding motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 3, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 9/30/2015. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 6, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation v. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: Kerry P. Faughnan
Represented By: James M Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?