Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland v. Big Town Mechanical, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Defendant: Big Town Mechanical, LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv00380
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2017 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 160 , 199 Fidelity's motions for partial summary judgment re: the Mack and Mitchell Elementary Schools are DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 14, 2017 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 311 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 287 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/17/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 7, 2017 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 151 Fidelity's motion for partial summary judgment that the unilateral fee provision is null and void is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 26, 2017 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 230 Travelers' objection seeking reconsideration of the privilege-log order is OVERRULED and reconsideration is denied. The 249 motion to strike is GRANTED in part; 264 Fidelity's motion to supple ment is DENIED as moot; 294 Fidelity's motion for reconsideration of the 10/18/17 minute order is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to VACATE 293 the minute order and reinstate the filings struck by it ECF Nos. 287 - 291 . See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 3, 2017 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 276 Motion to Reopen Limited Discovery. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 7, 2017 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 278 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Allow Deposition after Discovery Cut-Off (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 22, 2017 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED 172 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 21, 2017 266 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 252 Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 31, 2017 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 168 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Travelers to Produce Documents Previously Withheld as Privileged is GRANTED. Defendant Travelers shall produce documents responsive to Fidelity's document requests, that w ere previously withheld on grounds of privilege, within thirty (30) days of the filing of this order unless an objection to the order is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 9, 2017 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 209 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 172 Motion for Sanctions (First Request). Replies due by 5/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 23, 2017 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 89 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to file motions for summary judgment is extended until 45 days from the filing of this order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
November 21, 2016 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 140 Motion to Remove Attorney Sean T. Osborn, Esq. from the CM/ECF service list in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall remove Sean T. Osborn, Esq. from the CM/ECF service list in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 11/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 23, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 92 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 89 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 6/3/2016. Replies due by 6/17/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/23/106. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 13, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than May 26, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 8, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 50 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland v. Big Town Mechanical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Town Mechanical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Kurt C Faux
Represented By: Willi H. Siepmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?