Arcuri v. State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Paige Ann Arcuri
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company and State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv00416
Filed: March 12, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: 8th Judicial District Court - EDS)
May 23, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting a Hearing set for 5/29/2013 at 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe re 20 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 13, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 15 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Paige Ann Arcuri. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/20/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 7, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 13 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arcuri v. State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Ann Arcuri
Represented By: Robert D. Vannah
Represented By: Bruce D. Schupp
Represented By: Mark L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: David J. Feldman
Represented By: Rusty Graf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: David J. Feldman
Represented By: Rusty Graf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan L Dennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?