First 100, LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: City of Las Vegas and MTC Financial, Inc.
Plaintiff: First 100, LLC
702) 946-1345 (fax: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00431
Filed: March 14, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 65 Status Report. ORDERED that the parties shall have until September 16, 2016, to file the stipulation to dismiss with prejudice if they have resolved their disputes. If not the parties shall file a joint pretrial order.FURTHER ORDERED that NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE ALLOWED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 9, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 51 Stipulation for Extension re 1 Petition for Removal. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 12/5/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 5, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of MTC Financial, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against First 100, LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 11, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Defendant MTC Financial's Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall submit a proposed judgment consistent with this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 30, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 18 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by First 100, LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First 100, LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Reynolds
Represented By: Michael E Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First 100, LLC
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 946-1345 (fax: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Chelsea Crowton
Represented By: Robin P. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?