Karayan v. John A. Ritter

Plaintiff: Edward Karayan
Defendant: John A. Ritter
Case Number: 2:2013cv00493
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case for Settlement Conference. IT IS ORDERED that this case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
October 7, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties' obligations under the 41 Order to Show Cause are discharged; the parties must file their Joint Pretrial Order by 5:00 p.m. on 10/23/2015. This obligation to ensure that this task is completed is hereby imposed on both parties. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 22, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 25, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 STIPULATION for Protective Order which was granted. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule 10-5(b), that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karayan v. John A. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Karayan
Represented By: Burton C Jacobson
Represented By: Richard L Tobler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Ritter
Represented By: Bogatz & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?