May 9, 2017 |
Filing
156
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 117 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claim is dismissed without prejudice to the refiling of a new case. Plaintiff may only refile an action based on the instant f acts if he were to succeed in invalidating his conviction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 126 Defendant's Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court shall close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
April 27, 2017 |
Filing
155
ORDER Denying 154 Plaintiff's motion for the production of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
July 26, 2016 |
Filing
116
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 114 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 07/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
May 16, 2016 |
Filing
107
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall strike Plaintiff's untimely replies 104 and 105 from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
May 10, 2016 |
Filing
102
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint 82 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiff's fourth amended complaint 82 at 6 to 19 on the record.IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that Plaintiffs duplicate Motions to Amend the Complaint 81 , 96 are denied as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Appointment of Counsel 84 is denied.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs duplicate Motion for Appointment of Counsel 95 is denied as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Lift Stay 88 is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion Requesting Discovery 83 is Granted. The Court will enter a separate order governing discovery in this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Request for Interim Status Report 99 is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
March 1, 2016 |
Filing
79
ORDER Granting 76 Motion to Extend Time. Status Report due by 3/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
March 16, 2015 |
Filing
65
ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Continue Stay of Discovery Pending Outcome of Criminal Investigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 65 replaced on 3/17/2015 - nef regenerated) (MMM).
|
October 28, 2014 |
Filing
58
ORDER granting 57 Motion to Stay. Discovery shall be stayed until the earlier of either March 16, 2015 or the criminal proceedings against Defendant Steve Williams is complete. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status r eport on March 2, 2015 regarding the status of the criminal proceedings and necessity of the stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 10 days after the stay expires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
54
ORDER denying without prejudice 53 Motion Extend Prison Copywork Limit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
August 8, 2014 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting 51 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery shall be stayed until the earlier of November 6, 2014 or the criminal proceedings against Defendant Steve Williams are complete. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 10/30/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 10 days after the stay expires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
March 14, 2014 |
Filing
41
ORDER Granting 35 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Outcome of Criminal Investigation. Discovery shall be STAYED until the earlier of 9/2/2014 or the criminal proceedings against Defendant Steve Williams are complete. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that the parties shall file joint status reports on 5/13/2014 and on 8/1/2014. The parties shall file a joint proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order within 10 days after the stay expires or no later than 9/12/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 03/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
November 5, 2013 |
Filing
19
ORDER Accepting 11 Report and Recommendation. ORDERED that Plaintiff's 1983 claim and state law claim for negligent training and supervision against the LVMPD is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 1, 2013 |
Filing
16
ORDER that 15 Motion to Extend Copywork Limit is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 7, 2013 |
Filing
9
ORDER Accepting 6 Report and Recommendation. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim against all Defendants, Fourteenth Amendment claim against all Defendants, punitive damages claim against Metro, and claims against the individual d efendants named in their official capacity are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice because Plaintiff failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and amendment would be futile. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/2/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|