Dimick v. Lombardo et al

Defendant: City of Las Vegas and Douglas Gillespie
Petitioner: Ms. Mary Dimick
Case Number: 2:2013cv00562
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Petitioners 11 Amended Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment is Granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's 12 Request for Order Granting Motion for Reconsideration is Denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 9 Judgment entered 06/30/2015 is Vacated. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 03/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 30, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This Action is Dismissed without Prejudice. It Is Further Ordered that Petitioner is Denied a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 16, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of Court serve a copy of this order, 1 Petition and accompanying papers by mail to Sheriff Douglas C. Gillespie and Las Vegas City Attorney at addresses as noted in this order. Respondents shall have 45 days to answer. Petitioner shall have 45 days to reply to answer. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 7/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Sheriff Gillespie and Las Vegas City Attorney - EDS)
May 15, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order to show cause why the court should not dismiss the action for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 05/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dimick v. Lombardo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ms. Mary Dimick
Represented By: John G. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?