Johnson et al v. Bernstein et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson, Christine R Johnson, Chad Johnson and Derek Bryce Johnson
Defendant: Alan Ikeda, Jennifer Buitrago-Ikeda, Wendy Dahl, Annette Logan, Samuel Esparza, Jeremy Logan, Mary Warren dda Children's Specialty Center of Nevada doing business as Children's Specialty Center, Jonathan Bernstein, Ndhina Nhlane, Lisa Johnson, Faraz Norozian, Charles Hughes, Marc O'Connor, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC, St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus dba a Catholic Healthcare west doing business as Catholic Healthcare West, Michael Scheidler, Robert Knoblock, Theodore Moore, Berkley Brown dba a UCLA Dept of Pediatrics GRP Practice and The Regents of the University of California doing business as UCLA Dept of Pediatrics GRP Practice and The Regents of the University of California, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center LLC and Children's Specialty Center of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2013cv00641
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2018 Filing 416 CLERK'S MEMORANDUM regarding taxation of costs - #406 Bill of Costs by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein, #415 Costs Taxed. (AF)
July 9, 2018 Filing 415 COSTS TAXED in amount of $6,326.90 against Plaintiff re #406 Bill of Costs by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (AF)
July 9, 2018 Filing 414 CLERK'S MEMORANDUM regarding taxation of costs - #405 Bill of Costs by Defendant Alan Ikeda, #413 Costs Taxed. (AF)
July 9, 2018 Filing 413 COSTS TAXED in amount of $3,999.54 against Plaintiff re #405 Bill of Costs by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (AF)
July 9, 2018 Filing 412 CLERK'S MEMORANDUM regarding taxation of costs - #404 Bill of Costs, #411 Costs Taxed. (AF)
July 9, 2018 Filing 411 COSTS TAXED in amount of $2,778.45 against Plaintiff re #404 Bill of Costs. (AF)
July 3, 2018 Filing 410 NOTICE to Withdraw Bill of Costs by St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus re #403 Bill of Costs. (Weaver, Keith)
March 13, 2018 Filing 409 RESPONSE to #407 Response by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Lucero, Laura)
March 13, 2018 Filing 408 RESPONSE to #407 Response by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Weaver, Keith)
March 6, 2018 Filing 407 RESPONSE to #405 Bill of Costs, #404 Bill of Costs, #406 Bill of Costs, #403 Bill of Costs by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proof of ssdi)(Johnson, Christine)
February 22, 2018 Filing 406 BILL OF COSTS by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 3/8/2018. Tax Bill of Costs by 3/15/2018. (Ellerton, Marie)
February 20, 2018 Filing 405 BILL OF COSTS by Defendant Alan Ikeda. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 3/6/2018. Tax Bill of Costs by 3/13/2018. (Lucero, Laura)
February 20, 2018 Filing 404 BILL OF COSTS by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 3/6/2018. Tax Bill of Costs by 3/13/2018. (Cardinale, Paul)
February 20, 2018 Filing 403 BILL OF COSTS by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 3/6/2018. Tax Bill of Costs by 3/13/2018. (Weaver, Keith)
February 2, 2018 Filing 402 JUDGMENT in favor of defendants Children's Specialty Center of Nevada, St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus, Alan Ikeda, Annette Logan, Jennifer Buitrago-Ikeda, Jeremy Logan, Jonathan Bernstein, Jonathan Bernstein MD, Ltd, Mary Warren, Wendy Dahl against plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER that #375 , #377 , #379 , and #380 Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly for ALL remaining defendants. FURTHER ORDERED that all other outstanding motions are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 26, 2018 Filing 400 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 1/26/2018 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Christine Johnson, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Marie Ellerton, Esq, Anthony Lauria, Esq, Danielle Woodrum, Esq, Laura Lucero, Esq.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 10:16 AM - 10:41 AM; Courtroom: 7D.The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representation of counsel regarding #375 #377 , #379 and #380 MOTION(s) for Summary Judgment. The Court takes the motions under submission and will issue a written order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
January 3, 2018 Filing 399 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/3/2018. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing is set for Friday, January 26, 2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. The hearing will address the following: #375 , #377 , #379 and #380 Motions for Summary Judgment. A hearing is set January 26, 2018. The parties are ordered to appear at this hearing. Failure to appear at the scheduled hearing time may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to monetary sanctions, granting of the opposing party's motion or case-dispositive sanctions. Each party shall have three days to notify the Courtroom Administrator by email at blanca_lenzi@nvd.uscourts.gov if unable to attend and propose an alternative hearing time after consulting with opposing counsel.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
August 20, 2017 Filing 398 REPLY to Response to #380 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. Defendant Alan Ikeda, M.D.'s Reply in Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment (Lucero, Laura)
August 18, 2017 Filing 397 REPLY to Response to #379 Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Cardinale, Paul)
August 18, 2017 Filing 396 REPLY to Response to #377 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Ellerton, Marie)
August 18, 2017 Filing 395 REPLY to Response to #375 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weaver, Keith)
August 7, 2017 Filing 394 NOTICE: Action Required to #393 Response to Motion. ERROR: Documents should have been filed as separate entries by Christine R. Johnson , pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b): "For each type of relief requested or purpose of the document, a separate document must be filed and a separate event must be selected for that document" . CORRECTION: Christine R. Johnson is advised to only file the Motion for Summary Judgment contained in document #393 as a separate filing, using the appropriate Motion event. (no image attached)(DKJ)
August 6, 2017 Filing 393 RESPONSE to #380 Motion for Summary Judgment, #379 Motion for Summary Judgment,, #375 Motion for Summary Judgment, #377 Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. cj Replies due by 8/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
August 6, 2017 Filing 392 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
August 6, 2017 Filing 391 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. cjohnson (Johnson, Christine)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER Granting #388 Motion to Remove Attorney Janice Joyce Parker from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 24, 2017 Filing 389 JOINDER to #379 and #380 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Responses due by 8/14/2017. (Mandelbaum, Kim) Modified to reflect correct event and to add docket entry relationships on 7/24/2017 (DKJ).
July 24, 2017 Filing 388 MOTION to remove attorney(s) Janice J. Parker from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
July 24, 2017 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #389 Motion for Summary Judgment : ERROR: Incorrect event selected by Attorney Kim Mandelbaum. CORRECTION: Court modified docket to reflect correct event "JOINDER" and added docket entry relationships pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and LR IC 2-2(d). (no image attached)(DKJ)
July 18, 2017 Filing 387 JOINDER to #377 Motion for Summary Judgment, #380 Motion for Summary Judgment, #379 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
July 18, 2017 Filing 386 JOINDER to #377 Motion for Summary Judgment, ; filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Rurangirwa, Linda)
July 18, 2017 Filing 385 JOINDER to #380 Motion for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein, Jeremy Logan. (Lauria, Anthony) Modified on 7/18/2017 to add filer (DKJ).
July 18, 2017 Filing 384 JOINDER to #377 Motion for Summary Judgment, ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein, Jeremy Logan. (Lauria, Anthony) Modified on 7/18/2017 to add filer (DKJ).
July 18, 2017 Filing 383 JOINDER to #375 Motion for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein, Jeremy Logan. (Lauria, Anthony) Modified on 7/18/2017 to add filer (DKJ).
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #380 Motion for Summary Judgment, #379 Motion for Summary Judgment. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 17, 2017 Filing 381 FIRST NOTICE of Non-Compliance with LR IC 5-1. ERROR: #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment was not properly signed/filed in accordance with LR IC 5-1(b). The signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. Attorneys Linda Rurangirwa and Patricia Egan Daehnke are advised in the future that documents submitted using CM/ECF, must be filed by the attorney who signed the document, pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). No further action is required regarding document #380 at this time. (no image attached) (TR)
July 14, 2017 Filing 380 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Alan Ikeda. Responses due by 8/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Rurangirwa, Linda)
July 14, 2017 Filing 379 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein, Children's Specialty Center of Nevada, Annette Logan, and Jeremy Logan . Responses due by 8/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Christine Johnson's Initial Expert Disclosure, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Removal of Expert Witness in Expert Disclosure, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Removal of Expert Witness in Expert Disclosure, #4 Exhibit Excerpts of deposition of Christen Grimes, R.N.)(Cardinale, Paul) Filing Parties Modified on 7/17/2017 (TR).
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #377 Motion for Summary Judgment,. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 14, 2017 Filing 377 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Responses due by 8/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Mandelbaum, Kim)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #375 Motion for Summary Judgment,. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 13, 2017 Filing 375 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. Responses due by 8/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Weaver, Keith)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER Granting #373 Motion to Withdraw and Remove Attorneys Robert McKenna, III, Kevin Lazar, and Robert Cary McBride from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 7, 2017 Filing 373 MOTION to remove attorney(s) Robert McKenna and Robert C. McBride from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McKenna, Robert)
June 30, 2017 Filing 372 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #371 Proposed Pretrial Order by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Weaver, Keith)
June 30, 2017 Filing 371 PROPOSED Pretrial Order; filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith) Corrected image #372 attached on 7/3/2017 (RFJ).
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER granting #367 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER DATE. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 9, 2017 Filing 367 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER DATE by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER Granting #366 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Dispositive Motions Deadline. Motions due by 7/14/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER Granting #363 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #356 Scheduling Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/12/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 7, 2017 Filing 366 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re DISPOSITVE MOTIONS DEADLINE by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
June 2, 2017 Filing 365 NOTICE; filed by Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. (Dobbs, Tyson)
May 30, 2017 Filing 363 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #356 Scheduling Order, ; Last Day to File Joint Pretrial Order to June 12, 2017 by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER Granting #362 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Sunrise Hospital With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 24, 2017 Filing 362 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Sunrise Hospital With Prejudice by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. (Dobbs, Tyson)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER Granting #360 Motion to Remove Attorney Joan C. Foy from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 24, 2017 Filing 360 MOTION to remove attorney(s) Joan Foy from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Larsen, Robert)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER. The Court STRIKES the documents filed at Docket Nos. #357 and #358 and instructs the parties to refrain from filing discovery documents on the docket in the future absent a Court order that they do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 13, 2017 Filing 358 STRICKEN per #359 ORDER (MMM) NOTICE of Taking the Deposition of Scott Johnson by Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
April 13, 2017 Filing 357 STRICKEN per #359 ORDER. (MMM) NOTICE of Taking the Continued Deposition of Christine Johnson by Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 356 SCHEDULING ORDER re #355 Proposed Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 5/30/2017. Motions due by 6/13/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/30/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 11, 2017 Filing 355 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein Second Proposed Joint Discovery Plan Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f)(3). (Hopkins, Jay)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER Granting #353 Motion to Remove Attorney Kimberly L. Johnson from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 22, 2017 Filing 353 MOTION to remove attorney(s) Kimberly L. Johnson from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Lauria, Anthony)
March 16, 2017 Filing 352 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 3/16/2017. In light of the Court's 351 Order reopening discovery, IT IS ORDERED that #317 and #323 Motions for Summary Judgment are denied without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #292 Motion to Terminate Continued Deposition #294 Motion to Stay and #325 Motion to Strike are denied as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
March 14, 2017 Filing 351 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 3/14/2017 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Christine Johnson, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Jay Hopkins, Esq., James Fox, Esq., Laura Lucero, Esq., Janice Parker, Esq., Paul Cardinale, Esq.; Court Reporter/Recorder: A. Bareng; Recording start and end times: 3:37 PM - 4:07:30 PM; Time of Hearing: 3:37 PM - 4:07 PM; Courtroom: 7D.Pro se Plaintiff Christine Johnson is present. The Court makes preliminary statements.IT IS ORDERED that Discovery is REOPENED for seventy-five days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #345 Joint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's #300 Motion to Compel Deposition Appearance is DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deposition of Ms. Johnson in the state of Virginia shall be at the expense of the Defense. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall produce a notice of expert disclosure and testimony, CV and reports to defense counsel by thirty days. FURTHER, Plaintiff's filing of experts notice is due by thirty days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Fox shall submit a letter to counsel for the plaintiff, by the close of business on March 15, 2017, to request for the production of documents and written discovery. Plaintiff shall produce requested documents due by fifteen days thereafter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that notice of deposition shall be due by forty-five days from this date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that dispositive motions shall be due by June 13, 2017; Responses due July 5, 2017 with Replies due by July 25, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that at the close of discovery, the parties shall submit joint for proposed trial dates in the months of October, 2017 - first week of November, 2017, of acceptable dates for trial, should the case proceed to trial. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
March 8, 2017 Filing 350 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 3/8/2017. IT IS ORDERED that the Status Conference set for March 14, 2017 is RESET in time ONLY to 3:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
February 28, 2017 Filing 349 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 2/28/2017. IT IS ORDEREED that a Status Conference is set for March 14, 2017 at 2:30 PM before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. A hearing is set March 14, 2017. Plaintiff and counsel for defendants are ordered to appear at this hearing. Failure to appear at the scheduled hearing time may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to monetary sanctions, granting of the opposing party's motion or case-dispositive sanctions. Each party shall have three days to notify the Courtroom Administrator by email at blanca_lenzi@nvd.uscourts.gov if unable to attend and propose an alternative hearing time after consulting with opposing counsel.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER Granting #346 Motion to Remove Attorney Travis Chance from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 18, 2017 Filing 347 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 344 Motion Hearing, held on 12/20/2016, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia L. Ganci pattyganci@gmail.com. Any Redaction Request is due by 2/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 2/18/2017. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 4/18/2017. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
January 17, 2017 Filing 346 MOTION to remove attorney(s) Travis F. Chance from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
January 3, 2017 Filing 345 Joint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Hopkins, Jay)
December 20, 2016 Filing 344 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2016 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Christine Johnson, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Anthony Lauria, Esq.; Jay Hopkins, Esq., Laura Lucero, Esq., James Fox, Esq., Travis Chance, Esq; Court Reporter/Recorder: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 3:28 PM - 4:30 PM; Courtroom: 7C.Pro se Plaintiff Christine Johnson is present. The Court makes preliminary statements. For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's oral request to withdraw #307 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants shall file a joint motion to renew their #270 motion for a certificate of appealibility or joint motion for expedited schedule by 1/03/2017. The Court will issue a written decision and will place this case on an expedited consideration. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER Granting #342 Motion to Remove Attorney V. Andrew Cass from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 5, 2016 Filing 342 MOTION to remove attorney(s) V. Andrew Cass from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Cass, V.)
December 1, 2016 Filing 341 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 12/1/2016. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing regarding is set for December 20, 2016 at 2:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. The hearing will address supplemental briefing re 329 Minute Order: #330 & #335 Briefs, #332 & #334 Supplements and #307 Motion to Dismiss. A hearing is set for December 20, 2016. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear at this hearing. Failure to appear at the scheduled hearing time may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to monetary sanctions, granting of the opposing party's motion or case-dispositive sanctions. Each party shall have three days to notify the Courtroom Administrator by email if it is unable to attend and propose an alternative hearing time after consulting with opposing counsel.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
November 23, 2016 Filing 340 LETTER re: LR IA 7-1; filed by Jonathan Bernstein. (Hopkins, Jay)
November 14, 2016 Filing 339 REPLY to #330 Brief, ; DEFENDANT ST. ROSE DOMINICAN HOSPITAL SIENA CAMPUS D/B/A CATHOLIC HEALTHCARE WESTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS REPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON TOLLING OF THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
November 4, 2016 Filing 338 RESPONSE to #330 Brief,, filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Hopkins, Jay)
October 17, 2016 Filing 337 ERRATA to #334 Supplement ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Hopkins, Jay)
October 14, 2016 Filing 336 JOINDER to #332 Supplement ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Lauria, Anthony)
October 14, 2016 Filing 335 BRIEF re 329 ORDER; filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Rurangirwa, Linda)
October 14, 2016 Filing 334 SUPPLEMENT to 329 Order; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Hopkins, Jay)
October 14, 2016 Filing 333 JOINDER to #332 Supplement ; filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. (Fox, James)
October 14, 2016 Filing 332 SUPPLEMENT to 329 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS; filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
October 14, 2016 Filing 331 NOTICE per LR IA 7-1 re: #307 Motion to Dismiss; filed by Jonathan Bernstein. (Hopkins, Jay)
October 14, 2016 Filing 330 BRIEF re 329 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Certificate of Appealability; filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
September 29, 2016 Filing 329 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 9/29/2016. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Certificate of Appealability #270 is DENIED without prejudice. The Court instructs Defendants to provide supplemental briefing on the issue of whether the statute of limitations could be equitably tolled in this case such that the refiling of the same case by Plaintiff would have no substantive impact on her claims proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the supplemental briefing deadline is October 14, 2016; Responses will be due on November 4, 2016, and Replies will be due on November 18, 2016. Defendants may refile their Motion for Certificate of Appealability after the supplemental briefing is provided. The Court will address the issue of equitable tolling and the possibility of certification for interlocutory appeal before any trial in this case. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 21, 2016 Filing 328 NOTICE re #307 Motion to Dismiss; filed by Jonathan Bernstein. (Hopkins, Jay)
August 17, 2016 Filing 327 RESPONSE to #323 Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. Replies due by 9/3/2016. (Fox, James)
August 12, 2016 Filing 326 RESPONSE to #317 Motion for Summary Judgment, #325 Motion to Strike, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Replies due by 8/22/2016. (Johnson, Christine) Modified docket entry relationship on 8/12/2016 (DKJ).
August 3, 2016 Filing 325 MOTION to Strike #322 Reply to Response to Motion, by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. Responses due by 8/20/2016. (Fox, James)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #323 Motion for Summary Judgment,. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 29, 2016 Filing 323 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Responses due by 8/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine) Modified on 8/1/2016 to restrict access to exhibits 2, 7, 10, 13, 14, and 15 pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (DKJ).
July 28, 2016 Filing 322 REPLY to Response to #307 Motion to Dismiss, #317 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit Payment of services, #9 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine) Modified on 7/28/2016 to restrict access to exhibits 2 and 7 pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (DKJ).
July 27, 2016 Filing 321 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendants Jonathan Bernstein, Jonathan Bernstein, Alan Ikeda, Annette Logan, Jeremy Logan, St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center LLC, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. on Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Pro Se Litigant of Record and for Voluntary Dismissal (Mandelbaum, Kim)
July 20, 2016 Filing 320 REPLY to Response to #317 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. (Fox, James)
July 14, 2016 Filing 319 RESPONSE to #317 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Replies due by 7/31/2016. (Johnson, Christine)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #317 Motion for Summary Judgment. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
June 27, 2016 Filing 317 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. Responses due by 7/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Fox, James)
June 2, 2016 Filing 316 NON-OPPOSITION to #307 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Johnson, Kimberly)
June 2, 2016 Filing 315 NON-OPPOSITION to #307 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
June 2, 2016 Filing 314 NON-OPPOSITION to #307 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. (Dobbs, Tyson)
June 2, 2016 Filing 313 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #312 Non-Opposition by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Weaver, Keith)
June 2, 2016 Filing 312 NON-OPPOSITION to #307 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith) Corrected image #313 attached on 6/3/2016 (DKJ).
June 2, 2016 Filing 311 NOTICE of Vacating the Deposition of Plaintiff's Expert, Andrew S. Freiberg, M.D. by Jonathan Bernstein re #296 Notice (Other). (Mandelbaum, Kim)
June 2, 2016 Filing 310 NON-OPPOSITION to #307 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Daehnke, Patricia)
May 25, 2016 Filing 309 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 272 , Motion Hearing, held on 1/27/2016, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia L. Ganci pattyganci@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER Redaction Request due 6/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2016. (PG)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #307 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
May 19, 2016 Filing 307 WITHDRAWNMotion to Dismiss by Pro Se Litigant Christine Johnson by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine) Modified event on 5/19/2016 (DKJ). WITHDRAWN pursuant to ECF 344 (BEL).
May 18, 2016 Filing 306 JOINDER to #300 Motion to Compel ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Lauria, Anthony)
May 18, 2016 Filing 305 JOINDER to #298 Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Lauria, Anthony)
May 18, 2016 Filing 304 JOINDER to #300 Motion to Compel ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Hopkins, Jay)
May 18, 2016 Filing 303 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #301 Joinder. ERROR: Wrong document attached. Document is a duplicate of #302 Joinder. CORRECTION: Attorney Jay Hopkins advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document event under the Notices category and link to #301 Joinder. (no image attached)(DKJ)
May 18, 2016 Filing 302 JOINDER to #298 Response to #292 Motion to Terminate Continued Deposition, #294 Motion to Stay; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hopkins, Jay) Modified docket entry relationship on 5/18/2016 (DKJ).
May 18, 2016 Filing 301 ERROR: Wrong document attached. CORRECTION:Attorney advised to file a notice of corrected image. Attorney in stead refiled the Joinder. See document #304 Joinder. Document #301 is terminated by court. JOINDER to #300 Motion to Compel ; Joinder filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Hopkins, Jay)
May 16, 2016 Filing 300 MOTION to Compel Deposition Appearance by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. Responses due by 6/2/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dobbs, Tyson)
May 16, 2016 Filing 299 NOTICE of Attorney Action Required: to #298 Response to Motion. ERROR: Documents should have been filed as separate entries by attorney Tyson J Dobbs , pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b): "For each type of relief requested or purpose of the document, a separate document must be filed and a separate event must be selected for that document" . CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file the additional Motion contained in document #298 Response as separate Motion to Compel, using the appropriate event found under the MOTIONS category pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b).NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 5-1(b) that Tyson J Dobbs is in violation of Local Rule LR IC 5-1(b) The signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No action is required at this time. Attorney advised in the future to file documents in accordance with Local Rules governing Electronic Case Filing. (no image attached)(DKJ)
May 13, 2016 Filing 298 RESPONSE to #294 Motion to Stay, #292 Motion, filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. Replies due by 5/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dobbs, Tyson)
May 11, 2016 Filing 297 FIRST NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 5-1 that Kim Mandelbaum is in violation of Local Rule LR IC 5-1 The signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No action is required at this time. Attorney advised in the future to file documents in accordance with Local Rules governing Electronic Case Filing. (no image attached) (DKJ)
May 10, 2016 Filing 296 NOTICE of Taking the Deposition of Plaintiff's Expert, Andrew S. Freiberg, M.D. and Request for Production of Documents by Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
May 9, 2016 Filing 295 Certificate of Interested parties by Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine) Modified on 5/9/2016 to reflect correct event (DKJ).
May 9, 2016 Filing 294 First MOTION to Stay re #293 Notice (Other), #292 Motion by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
May 6, 2016 Filing 293 AMENDED NOTICE re: Discovery; filed by Jonathan Bernstein re #291 Notice (Other). (Mandelbaum, Kim)
April 27, 2016 Filing 292 First MOTION to Terminate Continued Deposition re #291 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Responses due by 5/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
April 20, 2016 Filing 291 NOTICE re: Discovery; filed by Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
April 12, 2016 Filing 290 SUPPLEMENT to #289 Supplement ; Initial Expert Dislcosure by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
April 12, 2016 Filing 289 SUPPLEMENT Initial Expert Dislcosure by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
April 12, 2016 Filing 288 Second SUPPLEMENT to #277 Supplement re Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
March 4, 2016 Filing 287 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein . (Mandelbaum, Kim)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER Granting #285 Motion to Remove Attorney Daniel B. Neidtke from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 25, 2016 Filing 285 MOTION to remove attorney(s) Daniel B. Heidtke from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Heidtke, Daniel)
February 24, 2016 Filing 284 ANSWER to #271 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Jonathan Bernstein.(Lauria, Anthony)
February 24, 2016 Filing 283 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #282 Response - Other by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Weaver, Keith)
February 24, 2016 Filing 282 ANSWER to #271 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith) Modified to reflect correct event and to add docket entry relationship on 2/24/2016 (DKJ). Corrected image #283 attached on 2/24/2016 (DKJ).
February 24, 2016 Filing 281 ANSWER to #271 Amended Complaint, filed by Jonathan Bernstein.(Mandelbaum, Kim)
February 24, 2016 Filing 280 ANSWER to #271 Amended Complaint, filed by Alan Ikeda.(Rurangirwa, Linda)
February 19, 2016 Filing 279 ANSWER to #271 Amended Complaint, filed by St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus.(Weaver, Keith)
February 19, 2016 Filing 278 ANSWER to #271 Amended Complaint, filed by Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC.(Dobbs, Tyson)
February 17, 2016 Filing 277 SUPPLEMENT Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents (First) by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
February 12, 2016 Filing 276 Amended NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Christine Johnson by Jonathan Bernstein re #269 Notice (Other). (Mandelbaum, Kim)
February 10, 2016 Filing 275 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein Joint. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
February 10, 2016 Filing 274 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #271 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Affidavit, #16 Affidavit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
February 9, 2016 Filing 273 JOINDER to #270 Motion for Certificate of Appealability, ; filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. (Dobbs, Tyson)
February 6, 2016 Filing 271 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Christine R Johnson. Removes parties. Proof of service due by 6/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Expert witness) (Johnson, Christine) Corrected image #274 attached on 2/10/2016 (RFJ).
February 5, 2016 Filing 270 Joint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Defendants Jonathan Bernstein, Jonathan Bernstein, Alan Ikeda, Annette Logan, Jeremy Logan, St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Mandelbaum, Kim)
February 1, 2016 Filing 269 NOTICE re: Discovery; filed by Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
January 27, 2016 Filing 272 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 1/27/2016 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Christine Johnson, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Jay Hopkins, Esq., Tyson Dobbs, Esq., Sean Kelly, Esq., Joan Foy, Esq., Kim Johnson, Esq., Laura Lucero, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 9:44 AM -10:25 AM; Courtroom: 7C.Christine Johnson, is present appearing Pro Se. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representation of the parties regarding discovery. For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's #160 First Motion to Extend Time to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be permitted to file a final third amended complaint, attaching the medical affidavit, removing her res ipsa claim and reference to the California defendants who are dismissed from this proceeding. This final complaint shall be due in two weeks - 2/10/2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #209 Motion to Strike #208 Surreply Brief is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #170 , #174 , #178 , #182 , #191 , & #210 Motions to Dismiss are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the California defendants' #176 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' #220 Motion to strike is DENIED. The expert affidavit will be admitted as attached to Plaintiff's final complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs #222 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's #255 & #256 Motions to Strike Joinders are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the discovery schedule shall be completed in four months' time with deadlines for dispositive motions. The Court directs that the Defendants' experts be made available in one city for one or two consecutive days for the taking of the depositions, should Plaintiff so require. The Court directs the parties submit a revised proposed joint discovery plan/scheduling order to this Court for approval in fourteen days - 2/10/2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants shall provide requisite release forms to Plaintiff Johnson in order to expedite the records process, to be completed within the week.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the transcript of the hearing shall serve as the written Opinion and Order of the Court. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
January 27, 2016 Filing 268 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 1/27/2016. Discovery is no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Koppe in this case; this Court shall handle all discovery matters moving forward. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
January 25, 2016 Filing 267 NOTICE that Plaintiff will Appear for 1/27/2016 hearing by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine) Modified text to reflect correct event on 1/25/2016 (DKJ).
January 23, 2016 Filing 266 EMERGENCY NOTICE re travel to appear for 1/27/2016 hearing by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine) Modified text to correct event on 1/25/2016 (DKJ).
January 19, 2016 Filing 265 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 1/19/2016. IT IS ORDERED that the hearing set for January 27, 2016 at 9:30 AM shall address all outstanding motions before this Court. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
December 31, 2015 Filing 264 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 12/31/2015. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing and oral argument is set for Wednesday, January 27, 2016 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. The hearing shall address the following motions: #169 , #170 , #174 , #176 , #178 , #182 , #191 , #210 Motions to Dismiss and #222 Motion for Summary Judgment.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Pursuant to FRCP 4(m). IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice as to defendants Robert Knoblock, Samuel Esparza, Ndhina Nhlane, Lisa Johnson, Faraz Norozian, Charles Hughes and Marc O'Connor. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 8, 2015 Filing 262 JOINDER to #234 Response to Motion; filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Daehnke, Patricia)
October 5, 2015 Filing 261 RESPONSE to #256 Motion to Strike, filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. Response Doc 244 Replies due by 10/15/2015. (Daehnke, Patricia)
October 1, 2015 Filing 260 RESPONSE to #255 Motion to Strike, filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Replies due by 10/11/2015. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
October 1, 2015 Filing 259 JOINDER to #258 Response to Motion; filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McKenna, Robert)
September 30, 2015 Filing 258 RESPONSE to #255 Motion to Strike, filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Replies due by 10/10/2015. (Johnson, Kimberly)
September 18, 2015 Filing 257 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT* in this action was filed on* 5/18/2015.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Robert Knoblock, Samuel Esparza, Ndhina Nhlane, Lisa Johnson, Faraz Norozian, Charles Hughes and Marc O'Connor.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 10/18/2015. (RFJ)
September 17, 2015 Filing 256 First MOTION to Strike #250 Joinder, #244 Response to Motion, #252 Joinder by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Responses due by 10/4/2015. (Johnson, Christine)
September 17, 2015 Filing 255 First MOTION to Strike #247 Joinder, #245 Joinder, #248 Joinder, #246 Response to Motion, #249 Joinder by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Responses due by 10/4/2015. (Johnson, Christine)
September 14, 2015 Filing 254 REPLY to Response to #222 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
September 14, 2015 Filing 253 REPLY to Response to #222 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
September 3, 2015 Filing 252 JOINDER to #244 Response to Motion; filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McKenna, Robert)
September 2, 2015 Filing 251 JOINDER to #246 Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. (Webster, Ken)
September 2, 2015 Filing 250 JOINDER to #244 Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. (Webster, Ken)
August 31, 2015 Filing 249 JOINDER to #222 Motion for Summary Judgment, #246 Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Johnson, Kimberly)
August 31, 2015 Filing 248 JOINDER to #234 Response to Motion, #222 Motion for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Johnson, Kimberly)
August 31, 2015 Filing 247 JOINDER to #234 Response to Motion, #222 Motion for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Johnson, Kimberly)
August 31, 2015 Filing 246 RESPONSE to #222 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Replies due by 9/17/2015. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
August 31, 2015 Filing 245 JOINDER to #234 Response to Motion, #222 Motion for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
August 31, 2015 Filing 244 RESPONSE to #222 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. Replies due by 9/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Daehnke, Patricia)
August 28, 2015 Filing 243 JOINDER to #235 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
August 28, 2015 Filing 242 JOINDER to #234 Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
August 28, 2015 Filing 241 REPLY to Response to #220 Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim) Modified text on 8/31/2015 (EDS).
August 28, 2015 Filing 240 RESPONSE to #222 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. Replies due by 9/14/2015. (Weaver, Keith)
August 28, 2015 Filing 239 JOINDER to #220 Motion to Strike #217 Notice of Manual Filing ; filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Daehnke, Patricia) Modified text on 8/31/2015 (EDS).
August 28, 2015 Filing 238 JOINDER to #235 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McKenna, Robert)
August 28, 2015 Filing 237 JOINDER to #234 Response to Motion filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McKenna, Robert)
August 28, 2015 Filing 236 JOINDER to #235 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McKenna, Robert)
August 28, 2015 Filing 235 REPLY to Response to #220 Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. (Webster, Ken)
August 28, 2015 Filing 234 RESPONSE to #222 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. Replies due by 9/14/2015. (Webster, Ken)
August 28, 2015 Filing 233 REPLY to Response to #220 Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Johnson, Kimberly)
August 26, 2015 Filing 232 ERROR: Entered in error by Clerk's Office. CORRECTION: Document Terminated. NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Amended Complaint* in this action was filed on* 5/18/2015.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Samuel Esparza, Ndhina Nhlane, Lisa Johnson, Faras Norozian, Charles Hughes, Marc O'Connor, Robert Knoblock, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 9/25/2015. (EDS)
August 18, 2015 Filing 231 RESPONSE to #220 Motion to Strike, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Replies due by 8/28/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
August 18, 2015 Filing 230 JOINDER to #220 Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, LLC's Motion to Strike #217 Plaintiff's Notice of Manual Filing of Expert Affidavit filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Daehnke, Patricia)
August 18, 2015 Filing 229 RESPONSE to #228 Joinder to Motion to Strike, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Replies due by 8/28/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine) Incorrect event used by counsel. Modified to link to proper document on 8/18/2015 (EDS).
August 17, 2015 Filing 228 JOINDER to #217 Notice of Manual Filing, #220 Motion to Strike ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Johnson, Kimberly)
August 16, 2015 Filing 227 RESPONSE to #220 Motion to Strike, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Replies due by 8/26/2015. (Johnson, Christine)
August 13, 2015 Filing 226 JOINDER to #220 Motion to Strike; filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
August 12, 2015 Filing 225 JOINDER to #220 Motion to Strike ; filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McBride, Robert)
August 11, 2015 Filing 224 JOINDER to #220 Motion to Strike ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
August 11, 2015 Filing 223 REPLY to Response to #210 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Daehnke, Patricia)
August 5, 2015 Filing 222 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Responses due by 8/29/2015. (Johnson, Christine)
August 5, 2015 Filing 221 REPLY to Response to #220 Motion to Strike, #209 Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
August 4, 2015 Filing 220 MOTION to Strike by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. Responses due by 8/21/2015. (Dobbs, Tyson)
August 3, 2015 Filing 219 JOINDER to #215 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McBride, Robert)
August 1, 2015 Filing 218 RESPONSE to #210 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Replies due by 8/11/2015. (Johnson, Christine)
July 30, 2015 Filing 217 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Expert Affidavit manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (MMM)
July 30, 2015 Filing 216 JOINDER to #215 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
July 29, 2015 Filing 215 REPLY to Response to #209 Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Johnson, Kimberly)
July 20, 2015 Filing 214 RESPONSE to #209 Motion to Strike, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Replies due by 7/30/2015. (Johnson, Christine)
July 20, 2015 Filing 213 JOINDER to #209 Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
July 17, 2015 Filing 212 JOINDER to #209 Motion to Strike filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McBride, Robert)
July 16, 2015 Filing 211 JOINDER to #208 Brief; filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
July 16, 2015 Filing 210 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. Responses due by 8/2/2015. (Daehnke, Patricia)
July 14, 2015 Filing 209 MOTION to Strike #208 Brief,, by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Responses due by 7/31/2015. (Johnson, Kimberly)
July 8, 2015 Filing 208 Second BRIEF re #193 Joinder, #191 Motion to Dismiss, #172 Amended Complaint,, #182 Motion to Dismiss, #195 Joinder, #204 Reply to Response to Motion, #185 Joinder, #186 Joinder, #176 Motion to Dismiss, #180 Joinder, #173 Notice of Manual Filing, #181 Joinder, #169 Amended Complaint, #203 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit Bernstein affidavit perjury, #7 Exhibit Christine Tonn is listed)(Johnson, Christine)
July 7, 2015 Filing 207 Response to #202 Reply to Response to #174 Motion to Dismiss and #192 Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
July 7, 2015 Filing 206 Response #201 Reply to Response to #176 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine) Modified text and to properly link on 7/8/2015 (EDS).
July 7, 2015 Filing 205 Response to #200 Reply in Support of #190 Joinder to #174 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine) Modified text on 7/8/2015 (EDS).
July 2, 2015 Filing 204 REPLY to Response to #191 Motion to Dismiss and #192 Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
July 2, 2015 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to #182 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Johnson, Kimberly)
July 2, 2015 Filing 202 REPLY to Response to #174 Motion to Dismiss and #192 Motion to Strike filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
July 1, 2015 Filing 201 REPLY to Response to #176 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McBride, Robert)
June 25, 2015 Filing 200 REPLY in Support of #190 Joinder to #174 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. (Dobbs, Tyson) Modified text on 7/8/2015 (EDS).
June 22, 2015 Filing 199 RESPONSE to #178 Motion to Dismiss, #176 Motion to Dismiss, #182 Motion to Dismiss, #170 Motion to Dismiss, #174 Motion to Dismiss, #191 Motion to Dismiss, #192 Motion to Strike, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Replies due by 7/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Johnson, Christine)
June 10, 2015 Filing 198 JOINDER to #192 Motion to Strike ; filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC (Dobbs, Tyson)
June 10, 2015 Filing 197 JOINDER to #178 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith) Filed under wrong event. Modified from Response to Joinder on 6/10/2015 (EDS).
June 9, 2015 Filing 196 JOINDER to #192 Motion to Strike filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McBride, Robert)
June 8, 2015 Filing 195 JOINDER to #192 Motion to Strike ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Lauria, Anthony)
June 8, 2015 Filing 194 ERROR: Wrong image attached. Corrected image filed at #195 JOINDER to #192 Motion to Strike ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Lauria, Anthony)
June 8, 2015 Filing 193 JOINDER to #191 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Lauria, Anthony)
June 8, 2015 Filing 192 MOTION to Strike #173 Notice of Manual Filing by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Responses due by 6/25/2015. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
June 8, 2015 Filing 191 MOTION to Dismiss #172 Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Responses due by 6/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Swails v. USA, 2010 U.S.App LEXIS 26766*4(9th Cir. December 6, 2010))(Mandelbaum, Kim)
June 8, 2015 Filing 190 JOINDER to #174 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC (Dobbs, Tyson)
June 8, 2015 Filing 189 JOINDER to #182 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC (Dobbs, Tyson)
June 8, 2015 Filing 188 JOINDER to #176 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC (Dobbs, Tyson)
June 8, 2015 Filing 187 JOINDER to #178 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC (Dobbs, Tyson)
June 5, 2015 Filing 186 JOINDER to #176 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Lauria, Anthony)
June 5, 2015 Filing 185 JOINDER to #174 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Lauria, Anthony)
June 4, 2015 Filing 184 RESPONSE to #174 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. Replies due by 6/14/2015. (Dobbs, Tyson)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #182 Motion to Dismiss : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 3, 2015 Filing 182 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Responses due by 6/20/2015. (Lauria, Anthony)
June 3, 2015 Filing 181 JOINDER #174 to St. Roses Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
June 3, 2015 Filing 180 JOINDER to #176 Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #178 Motion to Dismiss : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 1, 2015 Filing 178 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Responses due by 6/18/2015. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #176 Motion to Dismiss : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 28, 2015 Filing 176 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. Responses due by 6/14/2015. (McBride, Robert)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #174 Motion to Dismiss : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 27, 2015 Filing 174 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. Responses due by 6/13/2015. (Weaver, Keith)
May 18, 2015 Filing 173 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson re #172 Amended Complaint,,. Expert Affidavits Expert Affidavits to be included in Amended Complaint manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Johnson, Christine)
May 18, 2015 Filing 172 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jonathan Bernstein, Jonathan Bernstein, Berkley Brown, Jennifer Buitrago-Ikeda, Wendy Dahl, Samuel Esparza, Charles Hughes, Alan Ikeda, Lisa Johnson, Annette Logan, Jeremy Logan, Theodore Moore, Ndhina Nhlane, Faraz Norozian, Marc O'Connor, St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center LLC, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel, Mary Warren, filed by Christine R Johnson. Removes parties. Proof of service due by 9/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Johnson, Christine)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #170 Motion to Dismiss : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 13, 2015 Filing 170 MOTION to Dismiss re: #169 Amended Complaint; filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. Responses due by 5/30/2015. (Weaver, Keith)
May 8, 2015 Filing 169 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Christine R Johnson. Removes parties. Proof of service due by 9/5/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Johnson, Christine)
April 29, 2015 Filing 168 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address; filed by Alan Ikeda. (Rurangirwa, Linda)
April 23, 2015 Filing 167 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 4/23/2015. After considering Plaintiff's motion and Defendants' several Responses, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, for good cause shown, Plaintiff's #160 Motion to Extend Time to Amend Complaint is GRANTED in part and DEFERRED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until 5/18/15 to amend her Complaint. Absent a showing of exceptional circumstances, no further extensions on this matter will be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent that Plaintiff's motion addresses personal jurisdiction, a ruling on personal jurisdiction is deferred. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
April 17, 2015 Filing 166 RESPONSE to #160 MOTION to Extend Time to Amend Complaint re #156 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. Replies due by 4/27/2015. (Dobbs, Tyson) Modified to link to motion on 4/20/2015 (EDS).
April 16, 2015 Filing 165 RESPONSE to #160 Motion to Amend Complaint re #156 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. Replies due by 4/26/2015. (McKenna, Robert)
April 14, 2015 Filing 164 RESPONSE to #160 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Dispositive matter,, filed by Defendants Jonathan Bernstein, Jonathan Bernstein. Replies due by 4/24/2015. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
April 14, 2015 Filing 163 RESPONSE to #160 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Dispositive matter,, filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. Replies due by 4/24/2015. (Weaver, Keith)
April 7, 2015 Filing 162 RESPONSE to #160 FIRST MOTION to Extend Time to Amend Complaint re #156 Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Replies due by 4/17/2015. (Johnson, Kimberly)
April 2, 2015 Filing 160 FIRST MOTION to Extend Time to Amend Complaint re #156 Order on Motion to Dismiss; filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
March 26, 2015 Filing 161 NOTICE of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed in the US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. USCA Case Number 15-70941. (MMM)
March 7, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. CD DISC 911 call recording Dec 3 2011 manually filed with the Clerk's Office. CRJ (Johnson, Christine)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Granting #157 Motion to Remove Attorney Shirley Blazich from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 17, 2015 Filing 157 MOTION to remove attorney(s) Shirley Blazich from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant Michael Scheidler. (Blazich, Shirley)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER. The Report and Recommendation #133 is adopted as modified: Motion to Dismiss #73 is granted for failure to state a claim because of Plaintiffs failure to attach an affidavit as required by Nevada law. Motion to Quash, #71 is denied. Service is deemed effective as to individual Jonathan Bernstein. Motion to Quash #81 is granted in part and denied in part. Motion to Dismiss #76 is granted in part. Service is deemed effective as to Alan Ikeda. All medical malpractice claims are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim because of Plaintiffs failure to attach an affidavit. Motion to Dismiss #13 is granted for lack of personal jurisdiction and for failure to state a claim because of Plaintiffs failure to attach an affidavit, without prejudice. Motion to Dismiss #69 is granted failure to state a claim because of Plaintiffs failure to attach an affidavit. Motion to Dismiss #82 is granted for failure to state a claim because of Plaintiffs failure to attach an affidavit. Motion to Dismiss #87 is granted for failure to state a claim because of Plaintiffs failure to attach an affidavit. Motion for Demand of Security Costs #95 is denied. Motion for Default Judgment #143 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Alan Ikeda shall, within 21 days of the issuance of this order, deliver to Plaintiff the requested medical records. The parties are directed to develop a new discovery schedule under the direction of Magistrate Judge Koppe.Plaintiff shall have 45 days from the date of this order to amend the complaint. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
February 9, 2015 Filing 155 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 2/9/2015 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Christine Johnson, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Jay Hopkins, Esq., Kim Johnson, Esq., Cheryl Grames, Esq., Robert McBride, Esq., Laura Lucero, Esq., Tyson Dobbs, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 1:444 - 2:43 PM; Courtroom: 7C.Christine Johnson, is present appearing Pro Se. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations of counsel regarding outstanding motions. The Court finds, by the agreement of the parties, production of discovery by Dr. Ikeda, to Plaintiff Christine Johnson, shall be due by March 2, 2015. IT IS ORDERED that the matter is referred to the Magistrate to set a new discovery schedule. For the reasons stated on the record at this hearing, the Court takes the matter under submission. A written order shall be issued. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
February 9, 2015 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kimberly L Johnson on behalf of Defendants Jonathan Bernstein, Wendy Dahl, Annette Logan, Jeremy Logan, Mary Warren. (Johnson, Kimberly)
January 27, 2015 Filing 153 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 1/27/2015. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, for the reasons given, #151 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing and oral argument currently set for 1/29/2015 is continued to 2/09/2015 at 1:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the Plaintiffs want to seek a teleconference or video conference, Plaintiffs must file a new motion and set forth reasons why the new date presents specific issues. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
January 26, 2015 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel B Heidtke on behalf of Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Heidtke, Daniel)
January 26, 2015 Filing 151 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Appearance video conference. cjohnson Attorney: Pro Se Litigant Christine Johnson. by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER that #103 Report and Recommendation is Accepted and Adopted. Defendant Michael Scheidler is accordingly DISMISSED, and #78 Motion to Quash and #79 Motion to Dismiss, are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 16, 2015 Filing 149 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II, on 1/16/2015. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #109 Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLCs Motion for Hearing is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing and oral argument is set for 1/29/2015 at 11:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II regarding #13 MOTION to Dismiss, #69 MOTION to Dismiss, #71 MOTION to Quash Service of Process, #73 MOTION to Dismiss, #76 MOTION to DISMISS, #81 MOTION to Quash Service of Process, #82 First MOTION to Dismiss, #87 MOTION to Dismiss, #95 First MOTION for Demand for Security of Costs, #133 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, and #143 First MOTION for Default Judgment. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER that #144 Motion to Stay or Continue Discovery Deadlines is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Ghe Court GRANTS a 30-day extension of the discovery deadlines as follows: Discovery due by 2/13/2015. Motions due by 3/18/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER that the deadlines to amend the pleadings and for initial expert disclosures are temporarily extended from November 13, 2014, to November 20, 2014. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties that oppose or conditionally agree to Defendant's motion to continue discovery deadlines #144 shall file responsive briefing no later than November 17, 2014. The responsive briefing cannot rely on the adoption/rejection/modification of the Report and Recommendation #133 or the incorrect premise that the case is stayed until the Report and Recommendation is ruled on. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 12, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE re #145 Order, filed by St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER that #144 MOTION to Stay is DENIED. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to meet and confer, regarding each party's position on the pending Motion to continue discovery deadlines #144 . The Court further ORDERS that counsel for Defendant Dignity Health shall file a notice of all the parties' positions on the pending motion to continue discovery deadlines no later than 5:00 p.m. on November 12, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 4, 2014 Filing 144 MOTION to Stay or Continue Discovery Deadlines; filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. Motion ripe 11/4/2014. (Weaver, Keith)
October 1, 2014 Filing 143 First MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Motion ripe 10/1/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Bernstein BK CH7, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit Bernstein Perjury swearing, #5 Declaration Bernstein BK Declaration, #6 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
September 11, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 08A578610, 08A571470 by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Gyger vs sunrise et al, Bell vs Bernstein et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bernstein lists Tonn, #2 Exhibit Official bankruptcy documents, #3 Affidavit B affidavit stating bk true, #4 Affidavit Bernstein Affidavit perjury, #5 Affidavit Ikeda affidavit perjury, #6 Affidavit service by sups. Jan 2013, #7 Affidavit affidavit of service, #8 Affidavit affidavit of service)(Johnson, Christine)
September 2, 2014 Filing 141 RESPONSE to #137 OBJECTION to #133 Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified mail proof of service, #2 Certificate of Service Service of summons notes)(Johnson, Christine)Modified docket event type and linked to documents. (ASB)
August 26, 2014 Filing 140 JOINDER re: #137 OBJECTION to #133 Report and Recommendation; filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Daehnke, Patricia)
August 25, 2014 Filing 139 JOINDER to #137 Objection to Report and Recommendation ; filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. (Burris, Ryan)
August 20, 2014 Filing 138 JOINDER to #137 Objection to Report and Recommendation ; filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
August 16, 2014 Filing 137 OBJECTION to #133 Report and Recommendation; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Response to Objections to R&R due by 9/2/2014. (Ellerton, Marie)
August 14, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE re 134 Minute Order re Violation of Special Order 109,, : Notice is hereby given that Danielle Woodrum is now, and will continue to be, in full compliance with the requirements of Special Order 109 and the Electronic Filing Procedures. (Woodrum, Danielle)
August 12, 2014 Filing 135 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 8/12/2014. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II for all further proceedings. Judge Miranda M. Du no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:13-cv-00641-RFB-NJK. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 31, 2014 Filing 134 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 7/31/2014. Attorney Danielle Woodrum is in violation of Special Order 109. Counsel is advised to register for CM/ECF by completing the Attorney Registration Form from the Court's Website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Then file a "Notice of Compliance with Special Order 109" as a separate event under the "Notices" category. Notice of Compliance re: 109 is due by 8/15/2014.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RFJ)
July 30, 2014 Filing 133 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #71 MOTION to Quash Service be GRANTED; that #73 MOTION to Dismiss be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; that #81 MOTION to Quash be GRANTED; and further recommendations as enumerated. Objections to R&R due by 8/16/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/31/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 29, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson re #131 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,. Response to Courts order showing Plaintiff's intention for representation in this case manually filed with the Clerk's Office. Johnson, Christnie (Johnson, Christine)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER that Plaintiff Christine Johnson comply with the Court's instructions that she does not and cannot represent the other Plaintiffs in this case. FURTHER ORDERED that no later than July 28, 2014, Plaintiff Scott Johnson must file either a notice with this Court indicating that he intends to represent himself, or a notice of appearance on his behalf by an attorney. No later than July 28, 2014, a notice of appearance by an attorney must be filed on behalf of Plaintiff Chad Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/11/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER that #127 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/11/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 3, 2014 Filing 129 DECLARATION of Linda K. Rurangirwa in Response to Plaintiff's First Brief re: Order to Show Cause by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rurangirwa, Linda)
July 3, 2014 Filing 128 RESPONSE re #127 Order to Show Cause ; filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit recommendation to proposed discovery, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Defendant failed to acknowledgement, #4 Exhibit Tort Reform)(Johnson, Christine)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/7/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/20/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 SCHEDULING ORDER Denying #124 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The Court ORDERS the following discovery deadlines for all parties in this case: Discovery due by 1/14/2015. Motions due by 2/16/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/16/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/20/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting #107 Motion to Strike #99 Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 17, 2014 Filing 124 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda . (Rurangirwa, Linda)
June 17, 2014 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to #73 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Ellerton, Marie)
June 17, 2014 Filing 122 REPLY to Response to #71 MOTION to Quash Service of Process filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Ellerton, Marie)
June 16, 2014 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to #87 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Cardinale, Paul)
June 16, 2014 Filing 120 REPLY to Response to #81 MOTION to Quash re: Service; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Cardinale, Paul)
June 13, 2014 Filing 119 REPLY to Response to #76 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Rurangirwa, Linda)
June 11, 2014 Filing 118 SECOND NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109: that Danielle Woodrum is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Continued failure to abide by Special Order 109 will be brought to the Judges attention for appropriate action within ten (10) days. Please visit the Courts website www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select ATTORNEY REGISTRATION located in the middle of the web page to register.(no image attached) (RFJ)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER DENYING #116 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. ORDER that all Plaintiffs in this case and all Defendants who are not subject to the scheduling order (Docket No. 20) and extension (Docket No. 36) to submit a joint proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order in full compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, no later than June 17, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 9, 2014 Filing 116 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Rurangirwa, Linda)
June 7, 2014 Filing 115 RESPONSE to #73 MOTION to Dismiss, #81 MOTION to Quash re: Service, #71 MOTION to Quash re: Service, #76 MOTION to Dismiss, #87 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Cjohnson Replies due by 6/17/2014. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 AMENDED ORDER Denying #111 and #112 Defendants' Joinders. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all Plaintiffs and Defendants who are not subject to the #20 Scheduling Order must submit a Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 6/9/2014. Plaintiff Christine Johnson and Defendant Bernstein and Ikeda's proposed stay of discovery is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 06/02/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Denying #111 and #112 Defendants' Joinders. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all Plaintiffs and Defendants who are not subject to the #20 Scheduling Order must submit a Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 6/9/2014. Plaintiff Christine Johnson and Defendant Bernstein and Ikedas proposed stay of discovery is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 06/02/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 30, 2014 Filing 112 JOINDER to #19 Proposed Discovery Plan Scheduling Order; filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Rurangirwa, Linda)
May 30, 2014 Filing 111 JOINDER to #20 Scheduling Order; filed filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
May 16, 2014 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to #82 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
May 14, 2014 Filing 109 MOTION for Hearing re #69 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. Motion ripe 5/14/2014. (Burris, Ryan)
May 9, 2014 Filing 108 Partial JOINDER to #69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Alan Ikeda. (Rurangirwa, Linda)
May 9, 2014 Filing 107 MOTION to Strike re: #99 Brief; filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. Responses due by 5/26/2014. (Burris, Ryan)
May 8, 2014 Filing 106 NON-OPPOSITION to #73 MOTION to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
May 8, 2014 Filing 105 NON-OPPOSITION to #71 MOTION to Quash Service of Process ; filed by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Mandelbaum, Kim)
May 8, 2014 Filing 104 JOINDER to #69 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. (Weaver, Keith)
May 7, 2014 Filing 103 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's filing #97 be construed as a Notice of Dismissal regarding nominal Defendant Michael Scheidler, and that #78 MOTION to Quash Improper Service Attempt, and #79 MOTION to Dismiss be DENIED as moot. Objections to R&R due by 5/24/2014 Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER that #96 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re #71 Motion to Quash; #73 Motion to Dismiss; #76 Motion to Dismiss; #81 Motion to Quash; #82 Motion to Dismiss; and #87 Motion to Dismiss; is GRANTED. Responses due by 6/7/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 7, 2014 Filing 101 ADDENDUM to #100 Response to Motion, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
May 6, 2014 Filing 100 RESPONSE to #82 First MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. C Johnson Replies due by 5/16/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Affidavit, #11 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Christine)
May 6, 2014 Filing 99 STRICKEN per #125 ORDER (MMM) RESPONSE re #98 Reply to Response to Motion; filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
May 5, 2014 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to #69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. (Burris, Ryan)
May 2, 2014 Filing 97 NON-OPPOSITION to #78 MOTION to Quash Improper Service Attempt, #79 MOTION to Dismiss ; filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
May 2, 2014 Filing 96 FIRST MOTION to Extend Time re #87 MOTION to Dismiss, #82 First MOTION to Dismiss, #76 MOTION to Dismiss, #79 MOTION to Dismiss, #73 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Motion ripe 5/2/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
May 1, 2014 Filing 95 First MOTION for Demand for Security of Costs by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. Responses due by 5/18/2014. (Weaver, Keith)
April 25, 2014 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Alan Ikeda that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. . (Daehnke, Patricia)
April 25, 2014 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Weaver, Keith)
April 25, 2014 Filing 92 RESPONSE to #69 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Replies due by 5/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
April 25, 2014 Filing 91 RESPONSE to #69 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Replies due by 5/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Declaration Plaintiff rcvd April 23, 2014)(Johnson, Christine)
April 24, 2014 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Jonathan Bernstein. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Ellerton, Marie)
April 23, 2014 Filing 89 FIRST NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109: that Linda Ruringawa, Ryan Burris and Danielle Woodrum are in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Courts website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select ATTORNEY REGISTRATION located in the middle of the web page to register.(no image attached) (RFJ) Vacated as to Linda K Rurangirwa ONLY. (ASB)
April 23, 2014 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 89 Notice of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109. ERROR: The error notice re: violation of Special Order 109 was sent to attorney Linda Rurangirwa in error. The attorney's name was misspelled upon entry by the clerk's office, which created a duplicate user account. CORRECTION: The error has been resolved and Attorney Linda Rurangirwa is now receiving electronic notification in this case. The Notice as to attorney Linda Rurangirwa ONLY is vacated. (no image attached)(ASB)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #87 MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RFJ)
April 22, 2014 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Mary Warren. Responses due by 5/9/2014. (Cardinale, Paul)
April 22, 2014 Filing 86 ERROR: This document is a duplicate of #84 . Counsel was in formed in document 85 that the clerk's office had corrected the deficiencies. CORRECTION: This document is terminated. (ASB) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Webster, Ken)
April 22, 2014 Filing 85 ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #84 Certificate of Interested Parties. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Ken Webster advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations which have a direct, pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached)(ASB)
April 21, 2014 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Webster, Ken)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #82 First MOTION to Dismiss , #79 MOTION to Dismiss : Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 16, 2014 Filing 82 First MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus. Responses due by 5/3/2014. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/26/2014. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/31/2014. (Weaver, Keith)
April 16, 2014 Filing 81 MOTION to Quash re: Service; filed by Defendant erroneously sued herein as Mary Warren; Jennifer Buitrago-Ikeda, Wendy Dahl, Annette Logan, and Jeremy Logan . Motion ripe 4/16/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Christine Tonn in Support of Motion to Quash Service of Process)(Lauria, Anthony) Modified on 4/16/2014 to reflect correct filing parties. (BLG).
April 16, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #78 MOTION to Quash. ERROR: Documents should have been filed as separate entries by attorney, Shirley Blazich. In accordance with Special Order 109, a separate document must be filed for each type of document or purpose . Counsel advised in the future please file documents in accordance with Special Order 109 filing procedures to prevent delay in the timely filing of documents. CORRECTION: Court docketed the MOTION contained within document #78 as #79 MOTION to Dismiss.(MAJ)
April 15, 2014 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Michael Scheidler. Responses due by 5/2/2014. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/25/2014. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/30/2014. (MAJ)
April 15, 2014 Filing 78 MOTION to Quash Improper Service Attempt by Defendant Michael Scheidler. Motion ripe 4/15/2014. (Blazich, Shirley)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #76 MOTION to Dismiss: Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
April 15, 2014 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Alan Ikeda. Responses due by 5/2/2014. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/25/2014. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Alan Ikeda, M.D. In Support Of Motion To Dismiss)(Daehnke, Patricia)
April 15, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #71 MOTION to Quash. ERROR: Documents should have been filed as separate entries by attorney, Marie Ellerton. In accordance with Special Order 109, a separate document must be filed for each type of document or purpose. Counsel advised in the future please file documents in accordance with Special Order 109 filing procedures to prevent delay in the timely filing of documents. CORRECTION: Court docketed the MOTION contained within document #71 as #73 MOTION to Dismiss. (MAJ)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #73 MOTION to Dismiss: Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
April 14, 2014 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Responses due by 5/1/2014. (MAJ)
April 14, 2014 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan Bernstein, M.D. in Support of Motion to Quash Service of Process by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. (Ellerton, Marie)
April 14, 2014 Filing 71 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Defendant Jonathan Bernstein. Motion ripe 4/14/2014. (Ellerton, Marie)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #69 MOTION to Dismiss: Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
April 10, 2014 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC. Responses due by 4/27/2014. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/20/2014. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/25/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Webster, Ken)
April 3, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #67 Proposed Summons to be issued. ERROR: Summons not issued as multiple defendants are listed on summons and Plaintiffs Information is blank. CORRECTION: Pursuant to FRCP 4 summons are issued for each named defendant to be served. Christine Johnson to refile the proposed summons, listing only one defendant per summons and refile as a separate event using "Proposed Summons to be Issued" event. Please contact the Court at 464-5555 for any assistance pertaining to the filing of Summons form. (MAJ)
April 3, 2014 Filing 67 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
April 2, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #61 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Johnson, Christine)
April 1, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #61 Summons Returned Unexecuted. ERROR: Proof of service attached to document #61 is for a different defendant. ACTION REQUIRED: Attorney Christine Johnson advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document event under the Notices category and link to #61 Summons Returned Unexecuted to include the proper return of service for defendant Ndhina Nhlane. (no image attached)(ASB)
March 31, 2014 Filing 64 WAIVER of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Johnson, Lisa Defendant, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Christine R Johnson as to Jennifer Buitrago-Ikeda (Attachments: #1 Exhibit attempted; pending residential address)(Johnson, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Christine R Johnson as to Samuel Esparza (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Johnson, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Christine R Johnson as to Ndhina Nhlane (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Johnson, Christine) Modified to add link to corrected image on 4/2/2014. (MAJ)
March 31, 2014 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Christine R Johnson as to Charles Hughes (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Johnson, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Christine R Johnson as to Wendy Dahl (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Johnson, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Christine R Johnson as to Marc O'Connor (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Johnson, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Christine R Johnson as to Faraz Norozian (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Johnson, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Christine R Johnson as to Summerlin Hospital Medical Center LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Johnson, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Christine R Johnson as to Lisa Johnson (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Johnson, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine R Johnson re #47 Summons Issued. St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus served on 3/26/2014, answer due 4/16/2014. (Johnson, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine R Johnson re #50 Summons Issued. Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC served on 3/26/2014, answer due 4/16/2014. (Johnson, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine R Johnson re #47 Summons Issued. Jonathan Bernstein served on 3/26/2014, answer due 4/16/2014; Alan Ikeda served on 3/26/2014, answer due 4/16/2014; Annette Logan served on 3/26/2014, answer due 4/16/2014; Jeremy Logan served on 3/26/2014, answer due 4/16/2014; Mary Warren served on 3/26/2014, answer due 4/16/2014. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit)(Johnson, Christine)
March 31, 2014 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine R Johnson re #47 Summons Issued. Michael Scheidler served on 3/26/2014, answer due 4/16/2014. (Johnson, Christine)
March 4, 2014 Filing 50 Summons Issued as to Charles Hughes, Faraz Norozian, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC re #1 Complaint. (MAJ)
March 4, 2014 Filing 49 Summons Issued as to Jeremy Logan re #1 Complaint. (MAJ)
March 4, 2014 Filing 48 Summons Issued as to Jonathan Bernstein, Jennifer Buitrago-Ikeda, Wendy Dahl, Samuel Esparza, Alan Ikeda, Lisa Johnson, Annette Logan, Ndhina Nhlane re #1 Complaint. (MAJ) (Main Document 48 replaced on 3/4/2014) (MAJ).
March 4, 2014 Filing 47 Summons Issued as to Marc O'Connor, Michael Scheidler, St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center LLC, Mary Warren re #1 Complaint. (MAJ)
March 4, 2014 Filing 46 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
March 4, 2014 Filing 45 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
March 4, 2014 Filing 44 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
March 4, 2014 Filing 43 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
March 4, 2014 Filing 42 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
March 4, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE: Pro-Se litigant Action Required to #39 Proposed Summons to be issued, #40 Proposed Summons to be issued. ERROR: Improper formatting of Proposed Summons to be Issued; summons filed as one document with other inessential documents. Pro Se litigant Christine R Johnson advised: 1. Properly refile Proposed Summons as single attachments and NOT as one (1) single document., using "PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued" event under the Service of Process category. 2. Summons are to be properly filled out and issued in accordance with FRCP 4(a) and (b). 3. Copies of the Cover sheets and Certified Mail receipts are not to be included with Proposed Summons as they are not required when filing Proposed Summons. 4. Correct entry for the Plaintiffs line within summons shall read, Johnson et al and the correct entry for the Defendants line shall read, Bernstein et al. (no image attached)(RFJ)
March 4, 2014 Filing 40 ERROR: Improper formatting of Proposed Summons to be Issued; summons filed as one document with other inessential documents. CORRECTION: Pro Se litigant advised to refile Proposed summons in accordance with Special Order 109 and FRCP 4 (a) and (b). PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summerlin, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Johnson, Christine) Modified on 3/4/2014 (RFJ).
March 4, 2014 Filing 39 ERROR: Improper formatting of Proposed Summons to be Issued; summons filed as one document with other inessential documents. CORRECTION: Pro Se litigant advised to refile Proposed summons in accordance with Special Order 109 and FRCP 4 (a) and (b). PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine) Modified on 3/4/2014 (RFJ).
February 20, 2014 Filing 38 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #36 Order on Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter, addressed to Chad Johnson. Remailed to 14200 Acorn Lane, Rixeyville, VA 22737. (MMM)
February 10, 2014 Filing 37 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #36 Order addressed to Scott Johnson. No other address available, not re-mailed. (MMM)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting #35 Motion to Extend Time Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 1/14/2015. Motions due by 2/16/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 5, 2014 Filing 35 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (First Request) by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. Motion ripe 2/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(McKenna, Robert)
February 5, 2014 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe, on February 5, 2014, RE: #27 Order to Show Cause. On January 21, 2014, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause requiring Plaintiffs Chad Johnson and Scott Johnson to show cause in writing why their claims should not be dismissed for failing to update their addresses with the Court. Docket No. 27. Thereafter, Plaintiffs Chad Johnson and Scott Johnson updated their addresses with the Court and, additionally, responded to the Courts Order to Show Cause. For good cause appearing, the Court hereby DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause in its entirety. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KBB)
February 4, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson re #27 Order to Show Cause,. Plaintiffs Scott and Chad Johnson response to Order to show cause Responses due to Court by Feb 4 manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
February 4, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiffs Chad Johnson, Christine R Johnson. Christine R Johnson for minor as well (Johnson, Christine)
February 4, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Scott Johnson. (Johnson, Christine)
January 23, 2014 Filing 30 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #27 Order to Show Cause, addressed to Chad Johnson. No other address available, not re-mailed. (MMM)
January 23, 2014 Filing 29 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #27 Order to Show Cause, addressed to Scott Johnson. No other address available, not re-mailed. (MMM)
January 21, 2014 Filing 28 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #17 Notice re 4m Dismissal, addressed to Scott Johnson. No other address available, not re-mailed. (MMM)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs Chad Johnson and Scott Johnson are hereby ordered to show cause in writing, no later than February 4, 2014, why their claims should not be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Local Special Rule 2-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 17, 2014 Filing 26 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #20 Scheduling Order, addressed to Chad Johnson and Scott Johnson. No other address available, not remailed. (MMM)
January 17, 2014 Filing 25 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #14 Klingele Minute Order, addressed to Scott Johnson. No other address available, not remailed. (MMM)
January 17, 2014 Filing 24 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #14 Klingele Minute Order, addressed to Chad Johnson. No other address available, not remailed. (MMM)
January 17, 2014 Filing 23 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #17 Notice re 4m Dismissal, addressed to Chad Johnson. No other address available, not remailed. (MMM)
December 27, 2013 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 12/27/2013. By Judicial Assistant: Kathy Ryd. RE: #21 Brief: Plaintiff Christine R. Johnson has filed an emergency brief regarding the Court's Notice of intent to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) (dkt. no. 21). The Court finds that good cause exists to support Plaintiff's request for an extension of time for Plaintiff to effectuate service of process. It is therefore ordered that the deadline to file proof of service shall be extended to March 31, 2014, as to Alan Ikeda, Jennifer Buitrago-Ikeda, Wendy Dahl, Annette Logan, Samuel Esparza, Jeremy Logan, Mary Warren, LTD Jonathan Bernstein, Ndhina Nhlane, Lisa Johnson, Faraz Norozian, Charles Hughes, Marc O'Connor, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC, St. Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus, Michael Scheidler, Robert Knoblock, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center LLC. Failure to file proof of service by the extended deadline will result in dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KER)
December 26, 2013 Filing 21 Emergency BRIEF re #17 Notice re 4m Dismissal,, ; filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Christine)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #19 Proposed Discovery Plan Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/14/2014. Motions due by 5/14/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/13/2014.Defendants proposed stay of discovery pending a ruling on their motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/2/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 27, 2013 Filing 19 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McKenna, Robert)
November 22, 2013 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McKenna, Robert)
November 19, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint* in this action was filed on* 4/16/2013.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Alan Ikeda, Jennifer Buitrago-Ikeda, Wendy Dahl, Annette Logan, Samuel Esparza,Jeremy Logan, Mary Warren, LTD Jonathan Bernstein, Ndhina Nhlane, Lisa Johnson, Faraz Norozian, Charles Hughes, Marc O'Connor, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC,St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus,Michael Scheidler, Robert Knoblock,Summerlin Hospital Medical Center LLC.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 12/19/2013. (MAJ)
November 14, 2013 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), filed by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. Replies due by 11/24/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit establishes legal and moral obligation for 10 years of care, #2 Exhibit protocol requirements, #3 Exhibit protocol requirements, #4 Exhibit protocol requirements, #5 Exhibit Federal law, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Johnson, Christine)
October 17, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Firm Name Change; filed by Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. (McKenna, Robert)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6): Opposition due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven (7) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
October 14, 2013 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Defendants Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel. Responses due by 10/31/2013. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/24/2013. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/28/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McKenna, Robert)
October 14, 2013 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Berkley Brown, Theodore Moore, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel re #11 Request for Waiver of Service. Berkley Brown waiver sent on 8/13/2013, answer due 10/12/2013; Theodore Moore waiver sent on 8/13/2013, answer due 10/12/2013; UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel waiver sent on 8/13/2013, answer due 10/12/2013. (McKenna, Robert)
August 14, 2013 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Theodore Moore;UCLA on August 13, 2013 by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Johnson, Christine)
August 14, 2013 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Christine R Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Summons, #6 Affidavit, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Certificate of Service, #9 Summons, #10 Affidavit, #11 Certificate of Service, #12 Summons, #13 Affidavit, #14 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Christine)
June 10, 2013 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe, on June 10, 2013, RE: #8 Affidavit of Christine R. Johnson. On June 5, 2013, Plaintiff Christine Johnson filed an affidavit with the Court stating that she complied with the Courts May 6, 2013, Order. Additionally, Plaintiff requests permission to contact the CM/ECF Help Desk for help setting up a CM/ECF account. The Original Order #7 did not require the Plaintiff to seek further permission from the court prior to contacting the Help Desk for assistance. Accordingly, as the Plaintiff has complied with the Courts Order #7 , she may contact Robert Johnson at the CM/ECF Help Desk, at (702) 464-5555, for assistance.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KBB)
June 5, 2013 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Christine R. Johnson re #7 Order on Motion. (EDS)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part #5 Plaintiff Christine Johnson's Motion for CM/ECF Access. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent that Plaintiff Christine Johnson is requesting the Court allow her to use the courts CM/ECF system, the Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent that Plaintiff Christine Johnson is requesting the Court allow her co-plaintiffs to use the courts CM/ECF system, the Plaintiffs Motion is DENIED. Plaintiff Christine Johnson must comply with the procedures in this order before 6/6/13 to activate her CM/ECF account Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 30, 2013 Filing 6 EXHIBIT X filed by Plaintiffs Chad Johnson, Christine Johnson, Christine Johnson, and Scott Johnson. (EDS)
April 30, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION for Electronic Filing by Plaintiffs Chad Johnson, Christine Johnson, Christine Johnson, Scott Johnson. Responses due by 5/17/2013. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(EDS)
April 30, 2013 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Chad Johnson, Christine Johnson, Christine Johnson(Representing Derek Bryce Johnson, Decedent), Scott Johnson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (EDS)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 16, 2013 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service. (no image attached) (EDS)
April 16, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Bernstein, Berkley Brown, Jennifer Buitrago-Ikeda, Wendy Dahl, Samuel Esparza, Charles Hughes, Alan Ikeda, Lisa Johnson, Robert Knoblock, Annette Logan, Jeremy Logan, Theodore Moore, Ndhina Nhlane, Faraz Norozian, Marc O'Connor, Michael Scheidler, St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center LLC, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC, UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel, Mary Warren (Filing fee $ 350), filed by Christine Johnson, Scott Johnson, Chad Johnson, Christine Johnson(Representing Derek Bryce Johnson, Decedent). Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/26/2013. Proof of service due by 8/14/2013. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 receipt #NVLAS18407) (EDS)
April 16, 2013 Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Bernstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Bryce Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Ikeda
Represented By: Laura S Lucero
Represented By: Linda K Rurangirwa
Represented By: Kim Irene Mandelbaum
Represented By: Patricia E. Daehnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Buitrago-Ikeda
Represented By: Anthony D. Lauria
Represented By: Kimberly L Johnson
Represented By: Paul A Cardinale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Dahl
Represented By: Anthony D. Lauria
Represented By: Kimberly L Johnson
Represented By: Paul A Cardinale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Logan
Represented By: Anthony D. Lauria
Represented By: Kim Irene Mandelbaum
Represented By: Kimberly L Johnson
Represented By: Paul A Cardinale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Esparza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Logan
Represented By: Anthony D. Lauria
Represented By: Kim Irene Mandelbaum
Represented By: Kimberly L Johnson
Represented By: Paul A Cardinale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Warren dda Children's Specialty Center of Nevada doing business as Children's Specialty Center
Represented By: Anthony D. Lauria
Represented By: Kimberly L Johnson
Represented By: Paul A Cardinale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Bernstein
Represented By: Jay T. Hopkins
Represented By: S Marie Ellerton
Represented By: Kim Irene Mandelbaum
Represented By: Kimberly L Johnson
Represented By: Anthony D. Lauria
Represented By: Paul A Cardinale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ndhina Nhlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faraz Norozian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center LLC
Represented By: James W. Fox
Represented By: Jared F. Herling
Represented By: Ken M Webster
Represented By: Ryan Burris
Represented By: Tyson J Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St.Rose Dominican Hospital Siena Campus dba a Catholic Healthcare west doing business as Catholic Healthcare West
Represented By: Danielle Woodrum
Represented By: Trent M deBraga
Represented By: Daniel B Heidtke
Represented By: Janice Joyce Parker
Represented By: Joan C. Foy
Represented By: Keith A. Weaver
Represented By: Kim Irene Mandelbaum
Represented By: Robert S. Larsen
Represented By: Travis Franklin Chance
Represented By: V. Andrew Cass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scheidler
Represented By: Shirley Blazich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Moore
Represented By: Kevin Lazar
Represented By: Robert C McBride
Represented By: Robert McKenna, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Brown dba a UCLA Dept of Pediatrics GRP Practice and The Regents of the University of California doing business as UCLA Dept of Pediatrics GRP Practice and The Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Kevin Lazar
Represented By: Robert C McBride
Represented By: Robert McKenna, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UCLA Los Angeles Children's Mattel
Represented By: Kevin Lazar
Represented By: Kim Irene Mandelbaum
Represented By: Robert C McBride
Represented By: Robert McKenna, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summerlin Hospital Medical Center LLC
Represented By: Kim Irene Mandelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children's Specialty Center of Nevada
Represented By: Anthony D. Lauria
Represented By: Paul A Cardinale
Represented By: Kimberly L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?