Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Bourne Valley Court Trust
Defendant: Renee Johnson, Nevada Legal News, LLC and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
949) 863-3350 (fax: MTC Financial Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00649
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Granting Wells Fargo's 136 Motion for Summary Judgment. Bourne Valley's 153 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied and Bourne Valley's 158 Motion for Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d) Relief is Denied. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Granting 160 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 158 Counter Motion. Wells Fargo's Responses due by 12/11/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Granting 154 First Stipulation for Extension of Time re Re: 136 and 153 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/19/2018. Replies due by 12/10/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Granting 149 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline. Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 142 Motion to Stay Discovery. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 14 days of the court's ruling on Defendant's pending motion for summary judgment in the event any of the parties' claims survive. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Granting 144 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 142 Motion to Stay Discovery. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Replies due by 6/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Granting 139 and 140 Motions to Extend Time. Dispositive motions deadline is extended until 7/30/2018. Bourne Valley's response to Well's Fargo 136 Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to 60 days after the court rules on Freddie Mac's 133 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting 137 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 136 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 5/2/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting 131 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline (First Request). Motions due by 5/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting Bourne Valley Court Trust's 117 Motion to Extend Time (First Request) Re: 115 Motion for Protective Order. Responses due by 1/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting 112 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 107 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Replies due by 11/20/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion to Stay; denying 108 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 109 Motion. Discovery due by 1/30/2018., Motions due by 2/28/2018., Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting 102 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) re 90 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/23/2017. Replies due by 10/30/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 85 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 83 MOTION to Dismiss 78 Counterclaim. Responses due by 9/19/2017. Replies due by 10/3/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re the United States Supreme Court's denial of the petition for certiorari. In light of the foregoing, the stay is lifted. The parties shall within 30 days of the entry of this order meet and confer and file a proposed joint pretrial order in accordance with LR 16-3 and LR 16-4. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 65 USCA Mandate vacating and remanding the judgment of the District Court. Motions for Summary Judgment due by 2/23/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Plaintiff Bourne Valley Court Trust and against Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. The title to the property described in the attached Grant, Bargain, Sale Deed is hereby quieted in favor of Plaintiff Bourne Valley Court Trust as to any liens or encumbrances asserted by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that the stay in this case is hereby lifted. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file any motions for summary judgment they deem appropriate within forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Defendant's 38 Motion for Attorney Richard J. Reynolds to Appear Telephonically at Hearing. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that counsel for the parties shall appear on 5/19/2014 at 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro for a hearing on the parties' positions on whether the Court ought to stay this matter pending a decision by the Nevada Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER the Attorney General for the State of Nevada has 60 days from the date of this Order to intervene in this action, if it chooses to do so. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order on the Attorney Gen eral for the State of Nevada via certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall forthwith serve a copy of this Order upon the Attorney General for the State of Nevada. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 03/05/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying 6 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bourne Valley Court Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Legal News, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
949) 863-3350 (fax: MTC Financial Inc.
Represented By: Neal D. Gidvani
Represented By: Richard J. Reynolds
Represented By: Phillip A. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?