October 31, 2023 |
Filing
181
ORDER Granting 179 Motion to Extend Time re 168 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery and 170 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. Replies due by 11/22/2023. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/31/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
|
September 29, 2023 |
Filing
176
ORDER granting 175 Motion to Extend Time to File a Reponses to 168 and 170 Motions. Responses due by 10/24/2023. Petitioners Replies Due 20 days after Respondents File their Response to Petitioners Reply. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
|
August 1, 2023 |
Filing
174
ORDER granting 173 Motion to Extend Time to File Responses to, 170 Motion, 168 Motion. Responses due by 10/3/2023. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
|
June 21, 2023 |
Filing
172
ORDER granting 171 Motion to Extend Time. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Respondents Motion for Extension of Time 171 is GRANTED. Respondents will have until and including August 4, 2023, to file a response to Petitioners reply, a nd responses to Petitioners motions for leave to conduct discovery and for an evidentiary hearing. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the February 5, 2019, scheduling order 51 will remain in effect. Responses due by 8/4/2023. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
|
May 12, 2023 |
Filing
165
ORDER Granting 164 Motion for Extension of Time. Replies due by 5/19/2023. The schedule for further proceedings set forth in the February 5, 2019, scheduling order ECF No. 51 will remain in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
|
March 6, 2023 |
Filing
162
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 161 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner will have until and including 5/5/2023, to file a reply to Respondents' answer. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the 2/5/2019, scheduling order (ECF No. 51 ), will remain in effect. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), William Gittere is substituted for William Reubart as the respondent warden. The Clerk of the Court is directed to update the docket to reflect this change. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
January 9, 2023 |
Filing
160
ORDER Granting 159 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to 158 Answer to Habeas Petition - Death Penalty re 59 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Death Penalty. Replies due by 3/6/2023. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the 2/5/2019, scheduling order (ECF No. 51 ), will remain in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
June 13, 2022 |
Filing
157
IT IS ORDERED that Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 156 ) is GRANTED. Respondents will have until and including 9/8/2022, to file their answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner will have 120 days to file a reply to R espondents' answer; in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the 2/5/2019, scheduling order (ECF No. 51 ), will remain in effect.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d) , William Reubart is substituted for William Gittere as the respondent warden. The Clerk of the Court is directed to update the docket to reflect this change, (updated docket). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
April 8, 2022 |
Filing
155
ORDER Granting 154 Motion to Extend Time to Answer 59 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Death Penalty. Aaron Ford answer due 6/10/2022; William Gittere answer due 6/10/2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner will h ave 120 days to file a reply to Respondents answer; in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the 2/5/2019, scheduling order (ECF No. 51 ), will remain in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
March 1, 2022 |
Filing
153
ORDER granting 152 Motion to Extend Time re 59 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Aaron Ford answer due 4/11/2022; William Gittere answer due 4/11/2022. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
December 16, 2021 |
Filing
151
ORDER granting 150 Motion to Extend Time re 59 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Death Penalty. Respondents will have until and including February 8, 2022, to file their answer. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
November 8, 2021 |
Filing
149
ORDER Granting 148 Motion to Extend Time re 147 Order (Third Request). Respondents answer due 12/10/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
November 1, 2021 |
Filing
147
ORDER granting 146 Motion to Extend Time - Respondents have until 11/10/2021 to file their Answer to 59 Second Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petitioner will have 120 days to file a reply to Respondents' answer. In all other respects, the schedule set forth in the 51 Scheduling order will remain in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
August 4, 2021 |
Filing
145
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 144 Respondents Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Respondents will have until and including 10/11/2021, to file their answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner will have 120 days to file a reply to Respondents answer. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
April 12, 2021 |
Filing
143
ORDER Denying 140 Motion for Reconsideration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents shall, within 120 days from the date of this order, file an answer, responding to the remaining claims in Petitioner's second amended habeas petition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
February 26, 2021 |
Filing
139
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 71 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 123 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 125 Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing is DENIED. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
January 25, 2021 |
Filing
135
ORDER Granting 134 Motion to Extend Time re 123 , 125 Motions (First Request). Replies due by 2/18/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
October 26, 2020 |
Filing
127
ORDER Granting 126 Motion to Extend Time re 71 , 123 , 125 Motions (First Request). See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
October 7, 2020 |
Filing
120
ORDER Granting 119 Motion to Extend Time re 71 Motion to Dismiss (Third Request). Responses due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
August 7, 2020 |
Filing
118
ORDER Granting 117 Motion to Extend Time re 71 Motion to Dismiss (Second Request). Responses due by 9/29/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
June 5, 2020 |
Filing
116
ORDER Granting 115 Motion to Extend Time re 71 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
March 16, 2020 |
Filing
70
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 69 Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time is GRANTED. Respondents answer due 4/15/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
December 20, 2019 |
Filing
68
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 67 Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time is GRANTED. Respondents will have until and including 3/16/2020, to respond to the petitioner's second amended habeas petition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
October 18, 2019 |
Filing
66
ORDER Granting 65 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time re 59 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Second Request). Respondents answer due 12/16/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
September 10, 2019 |
Filing
64
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 63 Respondents Motion for Enlargement of Time is GRANTED. Respondents will have until and including 10/15/2019, to respond to the petitioner's second amended habeas petition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
July 9, 2019 |
Filing
57
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 56 Petitioner's motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Petitioner will have until and including 7/15/2019, to file his second amended habeas petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in 51 the order entered 2/5/2019 will remain in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
June 11, 2019 |
Filing
55
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 54 Petitioner's motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Petitioner will have until and including 7/8/2019, to file his second amended habeas petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in 51 the order entered 2/5/2019 will remain in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
April 18, 2019 |
Filing
53
ORDER that Petitioner's motion for extension of time (ECF No. 52 ) is GRANTED; Petitioner's second amended babeas petition due by 6/7/2019; in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered February 5, 2019 (ECF No. 51 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
February 5, 2019 |
Filing
51
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 48 Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Stay and Reopen Capital Habeas Proceedings is GRANTED. The stay of this action is lifted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), William Gi ttere is substituted for Renee Baker as the respondent warden, and Aaron Ford is substituted for Adam Paul Laxalt as the respondent state attorney general. The clerk of the court shall update the docket for this case to reflect these changes. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
November 21, 2013 |
Filing
31
ORDER Granting Petitioner's 23 Motion to Stay and Abeyance. This action is stayed to allow petitioner to exhaust in state court, all his unexhausted claims for habeas corpus relief. By 12/15/2013 petitioner shall file and serve a status report. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date this order is entered to initiate the appropriate state court proceeding, if he has not yet done so. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
July 9, 2013 |
Filing
13
ORDER that if necessary, petitioner shall file and serve an Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by 9/13/2013. Respondents shall have 60 days following service of the amended petition to file and serve an answer or other response to the ame nded petition. If petitioner does not file an amended petition, respondents shall have 60 days following the due-date for the amended petition to file and serve an answer or other response to the original petition which was filed on 4/18/2013. Petit ioner shall have 45 days following service of an answer to file and serve a reply. Respondents shall thereafter have 30 days following service of a reply to file and serve a response to the reply. (see Order for additional deadlines). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
April 25, 2013 |
Filing
6
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel is Granted. The Clerk of the court shall send a copy of this order to Michael Pescetta and serve the respo ndents by certified mail with a copy of this order and a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus. Respondents' counsel shall file a notice of appearance of counsel within 30 days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Michael Pescetta; mailed copies via certified mail to respondents- SLD)
|