Strong v. Bank of New York Mellon et al
Plaintiff: |
Brett B. Strong |
Defendant: |
Bank of New York Mellon and First Horizon Asset Securities, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00656 |
Filed: |
April 18, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 26, 2017 |
Filing
48
ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. ORDERED that the notice of pendency is hereby CANCELLED. A cancellation has the same effect as an expungement of the original notice. FURTHER ORDERED that 45 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 19, 2015 |
Filing
40
ORDER that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 22, 2015 |
Filing
39
ORDER that 33 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's amended complaint is DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERED that Strong has until June 8, 2015, to file a proper motion to amend his complaint to properly plead an intentional misrepresentation claim. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 8, 2015 |
Filing
38
ORDER that 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Joinder is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 17, 2014 |
Filing
31
ORDER that Plaintiff shall have until August 15, 2014 in which to file an Amended Complaint in accordance with Order 22 . Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 6, 2014 |
Filing
22
ORDER that 5 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of entry ofthis Order within which to file an Amended Complaint that cur es the deficiencies identified herein and contains sufficient facts to satisfy the pleading requirements of Rules 8 and 9 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as interpreted by Iqbal and Twombly to state a viable legal cause of action. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?