Terryberry v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: William Terryberry
Case Number: 2:2013cv00658
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 83 Stipulation to Stay Execution of the Judgment. Furthermore, the parties shall file a status report in this matter no later than 3/7/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 23, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 80 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED to the extent that it is not inconsistent with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff William Terryberry's 74 Motion for Re-taxation of Costs is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company's 75 Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs is GRANTED in part andDENIED in part.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's costs be retaxed at $4,195.37. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
April 14, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER accepting and adopting 70 Report and Recommendation. Denying without prejudice 62 Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter notice of Defendant's taxation of costs. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 22, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED as MOOT. Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 26, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 47 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 03/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 20, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall strike 13 Scheduling Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' Supplement to Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the following dates shall govern discovery. D iscovery due by 12/26/2013. Motions due by 1/27/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/26/2014. FURTHER ORDERED that any extension of the discovery deadline will not be allowed without a showing of good cause as to why all discovery was not completed within the time allotted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/20/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terryberry v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan K Dorsey
Represented By: Ian P. Gillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Terryberry
Represented By: Marjorie L. Hauf
Represented By: Ida M Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?