Holden v. Nevins et al

Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Warden Nevins
Petitioner: Jim Bass Holden
Case Number: 2:2013cv00668
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting nunc pro tunc 38 Motion to Extend Time to file 39 Amended Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 45 days from the date of entry of this order to answer or otherwise respond to the first amended petition 39 . Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/6/2016. (Attorney General of the State of Nevada answer due 7/21/2016; Nevins answer due 7/21/2016.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
April 22, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Petitioner's 34 Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Petition. Petitioner will have through 4/30/2016 to file and serve an amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 22, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Petitioner's 32 Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Petition (Third Request). Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus due by 4/7/2016. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 03/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 26, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Petitioner (Second Request) 29 is GRANTED. Petitioner will have through 3/8/16, to file and serve an amended Petitioner for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
November 18, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Extend Time to file Amended Petition (First Request). Petitioner will have through January 12, 2016, to file and serve an Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 14, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 23 Petitioner's Motion to reopen case and set briefing schedule. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall reopen this case and lift the stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner must file an Amended Pe tition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus within 60 days from the entry of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Proper-Person 22 Ex parte Motion to remove attorney of record and to appoint counsel is DENIED. Case reopened. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 13, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 18 Petitioner's Motion for Stay and Abeyance. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending exhaustion of the unexhausted claims. Petitioner shall return to this court with a motion to reopen within 60 days of i ssuance of the remittitur by the Nevada Supreme Court at the conclusion of the state court proceedings. The Clerk of Court shall administratively close this action until such time as the court grants a motion to reopen the action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 03/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 26, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. Petitioner shall have through February 17, 2014, to file and serve an amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 25, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 13 Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. Petitioner shall have through December 18, 2013, to file and serve an amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 23, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that petitioner shall have through October 18, 2013, to file and serve an amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/23/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 19, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Attorney William H Gamage is appointed as counsel for petitioner Jim Bass Holden for all further proceedings. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have sixty (60) days from the date on which this order is entered to file an amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holden v. Nevins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Nevins
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jim Bass Holden
Represented By: Rene Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?