Kal-Mor-USA, LLC v. Bank of America NA et al

Defendant: Bank of America NA, CTC Real Estate Services and Citibank (West), FSB
Plaintiff: Kal-Mor-USA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00682
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE pending exhaustion of all appeals and DENYING without prejudice all pending motions. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 20, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank , No. 15-15233 (9th Cir. Aug. 12, 2016). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are D ENIED without prejudice with leave to refile within twenty-one days after the stay is lifted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, beginning on 3/19/17 the parties must file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case every one-hundred and eighty days. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 63 Request for Representative's Exception to Attendance Requirements of Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 02/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 19, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 51 Motion to Substitute Party. U.S.Bank substituted for Bank of America NA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 29, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the stay is LIFTED. Discovery due by 8/24/2015. Motions due by 9/23/2015. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 17, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the following question of law is CERTIFIED to the Nevada Supreme Court pursuant to Rule 5 of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. All other pending motions are DENIED without prejudice. Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2014 and every three months thereafter. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; Mailed a copy of order to NV Supreme Court with official seal - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kal-Mor-USA, LLC v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Edward Chang
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTC Real Estate Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank (West), FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kal-Mor-USA, LLC
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?