Alcaraz v. Williams et al

Petitioner: Juan M. Alcaraz
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian Williams
Case Number: 2:2013cv00818
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Angela Dows, Esq. is HEREBY APPOINTED counsel for petitioner on appeal.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the sixty-day deadline for filing an amended petition erroneously set in the Court's Order of 9/23/15 is HEREBY VACAT ED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND a copy of this Order to the Court's CJA coordinator.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL NOTIFY the appeals Court Clerk of this appointment at counselappointments@ca9.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 23, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 27 Order by Ninth Circuit Court. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Angela Dows, 1333 North Buffalo Drive, Suite 210, Las Vegas, Nevada 89128, is appointed as counsel for petitioner for all future proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall have 60 days, until 11/23/15, to file an Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - E-mailed to 9th Circuit Court -PS)
September 14, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Ninth Circuit Court. USDC shall locate appointed counsel. The appointing authority shall send notification of the name, address and telephone number of appointed counsel to the Ninth Circuit Court Clerk at counselappointments@ca9.uscourts.gov within 14 days ( 9/30/15) of locating counsel. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) Modified on 9/15/2015 (PS). (Main Document 27 replaced on 9/15/2015) (PS).
January 27, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as untimely. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner is DENIED A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 21, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 10 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due within 30 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 16, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's 4 Order Dismissing Case is VACATED. The Clerk shall FILE and ELECTRONICALLY SERVE the Petition upon the Respondents. Respondents shall have 45 days within which to answer, or otherwise respond to, the Petition. Petitioner shall have 45 days from the date of service of the answer to file a reply. Case reopened. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 05/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 15, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this action shall be dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the required filing fee. No certificate of appealability will be issued. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 30, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the date this order is ENTERED in which to have the designated fee sent to the clerk. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action. The clerk is directed to RETAIN the petition but not file it at this time. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcaraz v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan M. Alcaraz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?