Board of Trustees of the National Roofing Industry Pension Fund v. A.W. Farrell & Son, Inc.

Defendant: A.W. Farrell & Son, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the National Roofers Union and Employers Joint Health and Welfare Fund and Board of Trustees of the National Roofing Industry Pension Fund
Case Number: 2:2013cv00825
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 5, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation for Stay Based on Pending Ninth Circuit Case and Potential Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 23, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without Prejudice 51 Stipulation for Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 28, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 43 Motion to Submit Supplemental Briefing is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 6, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 9, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 15 Motion to Stay is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the National Roofing Industry Pension Fund v. A.W. Farrell & Son, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Farrell & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Walter R. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the National Roofers Union and Employers Joint Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Kristina L. Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the National Roofing Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Kristina L. Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?