Sexton et al v. Hawkins

Plaintiff: Esquire Group LLC and James C Sexton, Jr.
Defendant: Karen L Hawkins
Case Number: 2:2013cv00893
Filed: May 21, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 65 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's 59 Response due 01/19/2016. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's 64 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/19/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 01/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 22, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 57 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to 56 Motion for Judgment (First Request). IT IS SO ORDERED that the United States (the defendant) may have an extension of time through 12/23/15, in which to respond to the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and that the plaintiffs may have an extension of time through 1/12/16, in which to file their reply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
October 30, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are not required to produce any documents or respond to any inquiries regarding the investigation of Mr. Sexton and/or Eqsuire Group LLC during the pendency of this acti on. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Defendant and the Internal Revenue Service shall NOT suspend or curtail the Plaintiffs ability to electronically file tax returns on behalf of clients for failure to comply with the demand for documents and information described in the Complaint in this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
June 19, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear as Government Attorney by W. Carl Hankla for Karen L Hawkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sexton et al v. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esquire Group LLC
Represented By: Puoy K. Premsrirut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Sexton, Jr.
Represented By: Desa Ballard
Represented By: Shawn R Perez
Represented By: Stephanie Weissenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L Hawkins
Represented By: W. Carl Hankla
Represented By: Blaine T Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?