United States of America v. $1,002,327.00 in United States Currency et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $1,002,327.00 in United States Currency, $39,451.60 in United States Currency, $46,173.56 in United States Currency, 2011 Chevrolet 3500 Express Van, VIN: 1GB3G3CG9B1113885 and 2012 Ford F-250 Truck, VIN: 1FT7W2BT1CEC44330
Case Number: 2:2013cv00947
Filed: May 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/31/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting 96 Motion to Continue the Discovery. Discovery due by 9/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting 86 Motion to Continue Magistrate Judge Hearing. Discovery Hearing reset for 6/8/2015 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Motion to Continue File Date of Reply Memorandum. Reply Memorandum due by 5/4/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Amended ORDER for Summonses and Warrants of Arrest in Rem for the Property and Notice Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 60 Motion to Amend Complaint. Amended Complaint Shall Be Filed Within 7 Days of the Entry of This Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Denying 47 Amended Second Request to Stay Discovery. A Status Hearing is set for 2/11/2015 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 51 Unopposed Motion to Continue Discovery Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2015 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr re: 47 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying without prejudice 45 Ex Parte Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying without prejudice 41 Motion to Compel. The Clerk of Court shall provide an electronic copy of the Courts 40 Sealed Order to counsel for both the Government and Claimants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 9 Motion to Unseal and Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $1,002,327.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,002,327.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $39,451.60 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $46,173.56 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2011 Chevrolet 3500 Express Van, VIN: 1GB3G3CG9B1113885
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2012 Ford F-250 Truck, VIN: 1FT7W2BT1CEC44330
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael A Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?