U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Banc de Binary, Ltd.
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Banc de Binary Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00992
Filed: June 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Granting 169 Unopposed Motion to Approve Consent Order for Permanent Injunction, Civil Monetary Penalty and Other Equitable Relief Against Defendants. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 02/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Granting 164 Stipulation Further Extending Stay of Action Pending Proposed Settlement. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Granting 162 Stipulation to Extend Stay until 12/31/15. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Granting 160 Stipulation Staying Action Pending Proposed Settlement. Notice due by 10/23/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Granting 157 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 145 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Response due by 8/28/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 153 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Date to Respond to 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 8/24/201. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/17/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting 134 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Motions due by 7/17/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/20/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Granting 124 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order. Motions due by 7/3/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 122 Motion for Order to Show Cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Corporate Defendants are SANCTIONED in the amount of $1,000.00. The check must be payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court, and wil l be credited towards the crime victims assistance fund. The Corporate Defendants must satisfy this sanction by 4:00 p.m. on June 15, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Overruling and Denying 102 and 108 Motions for District Judge to Reconsider Order. It Si Further Ordered that 115 Motion for Hearing is Denied as Moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting 117 Unopposed Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/20/2015. Motions due by 6/20/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. It is Further Ordered that 84 Response will remain unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER to Unseal 84 Commission's Opposition and 87 Declaration and Supporting Exhibits, filed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying 77 Motion for Protective Order and granting 80 Motion to Compel. Show Cause Response due by 2/20/2015. Request for Attorney's Fees is Denied. Request to modify the scheduling order is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/10/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Denying 76 Motion to Stay Discovery. Granting 79 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Granting 81 Motion to Extend Time to Disclose Experts. Granting 86 Motion to Seal. Granting 94 Motion to Extend Time to Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 73 Motion to Admit Government Attorney Kim G. Bruno to Practice in the District of Nevada for Duration of Attorney's Government Employment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 48 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due within 15 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying 18 Motion to Dismiss Counts One, Three and Four of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 41 Defendant's Motion for for Stay of Discovery pending adjudication of a dispositive motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery is stayed in this case until the earlier of the ruling on the dispositive motion or 5/27/2014. On or before 15 days after the stay is lifted the parties must file an Amended Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 20 Unopposed Motion for Entry of Consent Preliminary Injunction re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission. See document for specifics. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 06/05/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Banc de Binary, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc de Binary Ltd.
Represented By: Justin R. Cochran
Represented By: Craig S Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Margaret Pierson Aisenbrey
Represented By: Kathleen Banar
Represented By: Elizabeth N Pendleton
Represented By: David Steven Slovick
Represented By: Blaine T Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?