Securities & Exchange Commission v. Banc de Binary Ltd.

Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Defendant: Banc de Binary Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00993
Filed: June 5, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2016 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 155 Unopposed Motion to Establish a Fair Fund and Approve the Distribution of Funds Through a Parallel Action. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 03/07/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 23, 2016 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 149 Consent to Final Judgment of Defendant Banc De Binary, Ltd. (See Judgment for details.) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 16, 2016 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is stayed until 2/22/16.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Summary Judgment 126 and 128 are DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED if the SEC Commissioners do not approve a settlement or a final settlement is not otherwise reached, with all definitive final documents filed with the Court, by 2/22/16, then the litigation shall resume on that day, without further action of the Court and with the parties restored to their respective positions as of the date of this stipulation. The SEC may then refile its summary judgment motion on or before 2/29/16. Moreover, on or before 2/26/16, the parties agree to jointly request a status conference with the Court to address the remaining pretrial and trial schedule. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 5, 2016 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11:00 a.m. Friday, 2/12/16, in Las Vegas Courtroom 4B, before Judge Robert C. Jones.Parties shall dial the Meet-Me-Line Five (5) minutes prior to the hearing as follows: (888) 675-2535; Access Code: 2900398; Password: 021216. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited, the call must be made by using a land line. The parties shall remain silent on the line until the Court calls the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 25, 2016 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 141 Stipulation Further Staying Action Pending Potential Settlement. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 3, 2015 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 139 Stipulation Further Staying Action Pending Potential Settlement. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 3, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Commissions 118 Motion for Order to Show Cause is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Commissions 120 Motion to Seal is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants 122 First Motion to Extend Time is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Commissions 130 Motion to Seal is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
August 24, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the briefing on 126 Motion for Summary Judgment and the deadline to file the Joint Pretrial Order are stayed pending the decision on 118 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 2, 2015 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 111 Motion for Rule 60(b) Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 5, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DETERMINING ELECTRONIC SEARCH TERMS AND SCOPE OF SEARCHES. Discovery due by 3/13/2015. Motions due by 7/31/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2015. (See order for specific details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
December 16, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Motion to Reconsider. Granting 97 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
October 30, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Commissions oral Motion to Extend Discovery is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file a STIPULATION with proposed discovery deadlines by November 12, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
October 28, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 , 80 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 78 Motion to Seal 80 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 23, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 14, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Stipulation for modifications to scheduling order. Discovery is due by 9/19/2014. Dispositive Motions are due by 10/10/2014. Joint Pretrial Order is due by 11/14/2014.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
May 27, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 62 Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorneys. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 05/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 14, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 44 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Denying 46 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 59 Court's 4/17/2014 hearing is VACATED. If the parties do not reach a stipulation by 4/4/2014, the depositions will proceed in Washington, D.C. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 03/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 10, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 49 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint and Denying 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 03/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 3, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service of Process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Commission is permitted to service Mr. Laurent by email at oren@bbinary.com. The Clerk of Court will serve Mr. Laurent with the Commissions 41 Amended Complaint by return-receipt mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 03/03/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 10, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint and Granting 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear for Attorney Amy J. Longo for Securities & Exchange Commission. Plaintiff may file the proposed first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 01/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 7, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order 28 is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that 29 MOTION to Reconsider is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 30, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities & Exchange Commission v. Banc de Binary Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc de Binary Ltd.
Represented By: Justin R. Cochran
Represented By: Craig S Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By: John W. Berry
Represented By: Leslie A Hakala
Represented By: Blaine T Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?