Kal-Mor-USA, LLC v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: |
Kal-Mor-USA, LLC |
Defendant: |
Bank of America, N.A. and Fidelity National Title Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv01046 |
Filed: |
June 12, 2013 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Presiding Judge: |
Gloria M. Navarro |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 22, 2018 |
Filing
104
ORDER granting 103 Stipulation Confirming Existence and Validity of Deed of Trust. FURTHER ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for May 29, 2018, is hereby VACATED. FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 27, 2017 |
Filing
92
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re 88 Motion for Summary Judgment. For good cause appearing, the parties shall have an extension of fourteen (14) days from the issuance of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 5, 2017 |
Filing
90
ORDER Granting 89 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond/Resply re 88 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/22/2017. Replies due by 1/8/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 11, 2017 |
Filing
84
ORDER Granting 83 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Raffi A. Nahabedian of the Law Office of Raffi A. Nahabedian is substituted in the place of Charles Peterson, Neil Durrant, and Jason Martinez of Weil & Drage, for plaintiff Kal-Mor-USA, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 26, 2016 |
Filing
76
ORDER that 54 and 56 Motions for Summary Judgment are DENIED without prejudice with permission to renew within thirty days of the resolution of the Court's Certified Question to the Nevada Supreme Court.FURTHER ORDERED that the f ollowing question of law is CERTIFIED to the Nevada Supreme Court pursuant to Rule 5 of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure: Whether the rule of SFR Investments Pool I, LLC v. U.S. Bank, N.A., 334 P.3d 408 (Nev. 2014) that for eclosures under NRS § 116.3116 extinguish first security interests applies retroactively to foreclosures which occurred prior to the date of that decision.FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court under the official seal of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. See Nev. R. App. P. 5(d).FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending resolution of the Court's Certified Question to the Nevada Supreme Court. Beginning on September 23, 2016, the parties must submit a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case every sixty days. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
April 19, 2016 |
Filing
71
ORDER Granting 66 Motion for Exception to Attendance Requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 3, 2014 |
Filing
26
ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Neil B Durrant substituted for in place of the law firm of Maier Gutierrez Ayon for Kal-Mor-USA, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/30/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 17, 2014 |
Filing
17
ORDER certifying question of law to the Nevada Supreme Court pursuant to Rule 5 of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court under the offic ial seal of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. See Nev. R. App. P. 5(d).FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions are DENIED without prejudice, with permission to re-file upon resolution of the Court's Certified Question to the Nevada Supreme Court. FURTHER ORDERED that, beginning June 1, 2014, and every three months thereafter, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report, including a statement from Kal-Mor-USA affirming that all taxes, fees and maintenance fees are current and up to date. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc NV Supreme Court, Carson City, NV - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?