Schuett v. US Marshal Service et al
Plaintiff: Clifford James Schuett
Defendant: CCA Correctional Corp America, Ms Collins and US Marshal Service
Case Number: 2:2013cv01063
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Re: 27 Letter. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff may not pursue any claims in this action. To the extent that plaintiff believes that any of his constitutional rights have been violated, plaintiff may pursue a civil rights action or a petition for habeas corpus in a new action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying 25 Motion for a Waiver of the Filing Fee. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/12/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that 12 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuett v. US Marshal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCA Correctional Corp America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Marshal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford James Schuett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?