Gordon v. Hughes et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Gordon
Defendant: Tonja Barnicle, John Cleary, John Doyle, Kim Guthrie, Home Depot, Inc., Jeff Hughes, Lori Leavitt, Dorothy Perkins and Elmer Stratham
Case Number: 2:2013cv01072
Filed: June 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's 52 Request for a 60 Day Extension is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wishes to re-file her motion, she shall inform the Court of the efforts made to meet and confer with Defendant's counsel to try to resolve this issue without Court action. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 04/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting Defendant's 46 Motion to Amend/Correct Discovery Plan (Second Request). Discovery due by 5/11/2016. Motions due by 6/10/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 02/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED, that defendant Jeff Hughes' 32 Motion to Dismiss is Granted. Plaintiff's claims against Jeff Hughes are Dismissed With Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants John Cleary, Lo ri Leavitt, Dorothy Perkins, Tonja Barnicle, John Doyle, Elmer Stratham, and Kim Guthrie's 32 Motion to Dismiss is Granted. Plaintiff's claims against these defendants are also Dismissed With Prejudice. The only remaining defendant in this case is Home Depot, Inc. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 01/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Motion to Extend Time to Reply to 23 Motion to Dismiss. Reply due by 9/25/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than September 14, 2015 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Extend Time to respond to 23 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 8/31/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Extend Time. Proof of service due by 7/26/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Motion for a 10 Day Extension. Proof of service due by 7/13/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall provide proof of service on all Defendants by July 1, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Clerk of Court Shall File 11 Amended Complaint. It Is Further Ordered that the Clerk Shall Issue Summons to Defendants Named on the Complaint and Deliver to the USM For Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 7 Motion to Set Aside the Judgment. The Clerk shall set aside 5 Order Dismissing Case and 6 Clerk's Judgment. Amended Complaint deadline: 10/22/2014. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiffs Complaint. Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Amended Complaint deadline: 2/13/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonja Barnicle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmer Stratham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?