Takiguchi et al v. MRI International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kaoruko Koizumi, Fumi Nonaka, Tatsuro Sakai, Yozo Skiki, Shige Takiguchi and Mitsuaki Takita
Defendant: Edwin J Fujinaga, LVT, Inc., MRI International, Inc., Junzo Suzuki and Paul Musashi Suzuki
Case Number: 2:2013cv01183
Filed: July 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 913 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH MRI INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND EDWIN FUJINAGA Re: 911 Proposed Order Submission. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 892 ORDER granting ECF No. 889 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with MRI International, Inc. and Edwin Fujinaga. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 888 ORDER granting ECF No. 885 Amended StipulationAuthorizing the Sale of 445 Seaside Avenue #3014, Honolulu, Hawaii 96815. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/2/2019. (ECF No. 884 Stipulation terminated as amended.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 880 ORDER granting ECF No. 879 Stipulation Authorizing the Sale of 145 E. Harmon Ave. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 872 ORDER granting ECF No. 871 Plaintiffs' Request for an Extension to Mail the Notice to Submit Claim. Plaintiffs shall have until January 7, 2019 to complete the mailing of the notice to submit claim. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ORDER granting ECF No. 864 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as against defendant First Hawaiian Bank. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 862 ORDER granting ECF No. 861 Stipulation Re Liquidation of Life Insurance Policy and Payment of Funds Pursuant to Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER granting ECF No. 851 Stipulation re Directing Payment of Funds Held in Trust by Law Firms and Financial Institutions Pursuant to Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 829 ORDER granting ECF No. 828 Stipulation for Payment of SEI PSP's April 2018 Attorneys' Fees. See order for specific details. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ORDER approving ECF No. 817 Stipulation for Payment of SEI PSP's March 2018 Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 816 ORDER granting ECF No. 815 Stipulation Allowing Kazuya Fujimura to Withdraw His Request for Exclusion and Rejoin the Class. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER granting ECF No. 809 Stipulation Authorizing the Sale of 145 E. Harmon Ave., Units 2702 & 2704. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER approving ECF No. 807 Stipulation. Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement as to MRI International Inc and Edwin Fujinaga is due by 4/17/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 805 ORDER granting ECF No. 802 Plaintiff Yuko Nakamura's Stipulation that allows Naomi Ukei to Withdraw Her Request for Exclusion and Rejoin the Class. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 797 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH SUZUKI SETTLING DEFENDANTS Re: ECF No. 795 Proposed Order Submission. Telephonic Final Approval Hearing reset for Tuesday, 5/22/2018 at 9:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 4 before Judge Howard D. McKibben. Participants shall call AT&T no later than five minutes prior to the hearing at 1 (877) 336-1839 and provide Access Code 3246567 with Security Code 0376. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 1/11/2018 to include Final Approval Hearing information (PR).
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 793 ORDER granting ECF No. 792 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to file a motion for preliminary approval. Motion due by 2/9/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 789 ORDER GRANTING MOTION (ECF No. 776 ) FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH SUZUKI DEFENDANTS A final telephonic hearing on the Settlement Agreement ("Final Approval Hearing") shall be held before the Court at 9: 00 a.m. on April 26, 2018 in Courtroom 4 of United States District Court of Nevada, 400 South Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada 89501. Participants shall call AT&T no later than five minutes prior to the hearing at 1 (877) 336-1839 and provide Access Code 3246567 with Security Code 0377. (See pdf order for additional deadlines and specifics.) Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/3/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER granting ECF No. 778 Stipulation to add (1) Catherine Suzuki, trustee of the Junzo Suzuki Irrevocable Trust, (2) Catherine Suzuki, trustee of the Keiko Suzuki Irrevocable Trust, and (3) Catherine Suzuki, trustee of the Junzo and Keiko Suzuki Irrevocable Trust, as defendants to this action. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER granting ECF No. 774 Stipulation for Extension of Time to file a motion for preliminary approval. Motion due by 1/10/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ORDER granting ECF No. 758 Stipulation for Continuance of Deadline to file Dispositive Motions as to Defendant ICAG, Inc. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER - Defendant First Hawaiian Bank's motions for leave to file under seal are GRANTED IN PART. The birthdates contained in the trust documents shall remain under seal. FHB is accordingly ordered to refile the trust documents (ECF Nos. [72 9]-2 & 732 -2 at 6-56), not under seal, with the birth dates redacted. FHB is further ordered to file, not under seal, its unredacted opposition to the application for order to show cause (ECF No,. 732 -1) and its unredacted reply to the plaintiffs' response to its motion for attorney's fees (ECF No. 738 ). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER - First Hawaiian Bank shall file a response to the plaintiffs' application for an order to show cause (ECF No. 721 ) on or before September 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' ECF No. 687 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with LVT Inc, d/b/a Sterling Escrow. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 697 ORDER FOR PREPARATION OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS - Proposed Jury Instructions due on Monday, 7/3/2017. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/5/2017. (See attached.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PR)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER denying without prejudice ECF Nos. 615 / 666 Defendants' Motions for Attorney Fees. Any renewed briefing shall address the concerns outlined in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 05/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER granting ECF No. 671 Stipulation re Payment of Attorneys Fees and Costs Incurred by Suzuki Enterprises, Inc. Profit Sharing Plan During April 2017. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER granting ECF No. 641 Motion for Leave to File : Damon Key shall file its surreply, attached as Exhibit 1 to the motion, on or before April 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment ECF Nos. 520 , 529 and 530 are DENIED. The parties' evidentiary objections are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renew at trial. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 02/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER re ECF No. 600 Objections, affirming in part and reversing in part ECF No. 585 Order. The Court approves the release to Paul Hastings of attorney's fees for August 2016 in the amount of $27,462.89, and the release to McDonald Carano of attorney's fees for August 2016 in the amount of $800.00. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER directing that Plaintiffs' ECF No. 602 Motion for Order to Show Cause be unsealed. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER that the Court's Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to Seal the MSJ ECF No. 531 is VACATED; Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal ECF No. 528 is DENIED; Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 529 shall be UNSEALED. < p>IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Suzukis' Motion to Seal ECF No. 562 is DENIED; Suzukis' responses to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts ECF Nos. 564 and 567 shall be UNSEALED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal ECF No. 578 is DENIED; Plaintiffs' Reply to Suzuki's Response... ECF No. 579 shall be UNSEALED. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 01/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER denying ECF No. 562 Defendant Suzukis' Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 01/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 504 Motion for Attorney Fees; $35,612.89 is release to Paul Hastings for legal fees and expenses billed in August 2016. Fee for work related to the preparation of fee motions is red uced from $8,230 to $4,900; $800 is released to McDonald Carano for legal fees and expenses billed in August. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/09/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER FOR PREPARATION OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PR)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER adopting and accepting ECF No. 463 Report and Recommendations of U.S. Magistrate; Motion for Release of Funds ECF No. 447 is granted in part and denied in part. Junzo and Paul Musashi Suzuki shall be allowed topay $32,600.44 to Zaccaro Morgan and $300.00 to McDonald Carano forlegal fees and expenses billed in the month of June 2016. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting ECF No. 469 Suzukis' Motion for release of Additional Funds. It is further ordered that $25,370 is released to Paul Hastings and $302.70 is released to McDonald Carano for legal fees and expenses billed in July 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' ECF No. 466 Motion to Compel; directing that the parties complete Paul Suzuki's deposition in Los Angeles, CA by 10/28/2016. If Paul Suzuki insists that his deposition be taken in Japan, he will be required to reimburse any travel expenses related to the reconvened deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 468 Motion to to File Under Seal; and the motion to compel (ECF No. 467 ) is sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER denying ECF No. 455 Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 09/02/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' ECF No. 458 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER DENYING ECF No. 445 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER re ECF No. 439 Status Report. The Suzukis may pay up to $10,000.00 per month for attorney's fees relating to this litigation only and up to $5,000.00 per month for expenses related to the preservation of assets. The Suz ukis shall file monthly accountings with the court detailing any such expenditures. Please see attached for further details. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 438 AMENDED DEPOSITION ORDER. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 435 DEPOSITION ORDER - Depositons be taken at the U.S. Embassy in Tokyo, Japan, commencing on or about June 29, 2016 and continuing until on or about July 1, 2016 as to (1) Junzo Suzuki, (2) Paul Suzuki, and(3) Hidenao Takama. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER granting ECF No. 428 Stipulation Re: Notice of Class Certification. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER granting 425 Stipulation to Amend Class Definition. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 352 Motion to Compel; overruling the Suzukis' objections to Plaintiff's first set of interrogatories; sustaining the Suzukis' Fifth Amendment objections to Plaintiff's second set of interrogatories; supplementing 373 Order as follows (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER granting 255 Motion to Certify Class (see attached for details). Plaintiffs' proposed form of notice due 4/5/2016. Objections due 4/15/2016. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 3/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER Granting 388 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 3/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER re 382 Motion for Order to Show Cause, filed by Yuko Nakamura. The Defendants Junzo Suzuki and Paul Musashi Suzuki shall have until 3/7/16, within which to file a response to the application. Plaintiffs shall have until 3/14/16, within which to file a reply. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) Modified on 2/26/2016 to correct docket entry date of response deadline. (PR)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal 379 . Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion and the entire record of this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to File Under Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 344 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. On or before 3/10/16, the Suzukis must produce responsive documents or submit a declaration. On or before 3/10/16, the Suzukis must submit a privilege log. (See Order for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER Granting 369 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Edwin Fujinaga to Oppose Plaintiff's 358 MOTION to Compel. Defendant Edwin Fujinaga shall have until 3/4/16 to file his reply brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER Denying without prejudice 253 Renewed Motion for Order Permitting Sale of Real Property, filed by Junzo Suzuki and Paul Musashi Suzuki. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER IT IS ORDERED that the Suzukis' Motion For Order Compelling Deposition and Interpreter Costs and for Sanctions 322 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Suzukis will pay for any interpreters needed at the Plaintiffs' depos itions which the Suzukis have already noticed. In the future, the party noticing a deposition will pay for any interpreters needed for any deposition the party notices.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following Plaintiffs be deposed in Los Angeles, California before 5/6/16: 1. Shige Takiguchi; 2. Tatsuro Sakai and 3. Hidenao Takama Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER Granting 342 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Reply to Defendants' Opposition to 255 Motion to Certify Class filed by Yuko Nakamura. Replies due by 1/14/2016. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Junzo Suzuki and Paul Musashi Suzuki's Request for Nicolas Morgan from the Law Offices of Zaccaro Morgan, LLP to Appear Telephonically for the 1/20/16 Hearing 340 is GRANTED. However, only counsel present in person at the hearing may make substantive representations and arguments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/31/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Defendants Junzo Suzuki's and Paul Suzuki's Motion for Order Compelling Deposition and Interpreter Costs and for Sanctions 322 is scheduled for 2:00 p.m., 1/20/16, in courtroom 3D. Counsel ap pearing in person must be prepared to address a firm schedule for completing Plaintiff's depositions and briefing on class certification motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER Granting 334 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER re 324 Emergency MOTION for Interpreters Fees re: Discovery. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Order that Junzo and Paul Suzuki Pay for Interpreters Required for Depositions that the Suzukis Notic ed of Plaintiffs 324 is scheduled for 9:00 a.m., November 25, 2015, in courtroom 3D.Local counsel must appear in person at the hearing and be prepared to argue the merits of the instant motion. Out of state counsel may appear telephonically. The call in conference number is 1-702- 464-5625. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER Denying Suzukis' 209 Motion to Dismiss and Suzukis' 276 Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER Denying 283 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER. The Suzuki Defendants have filed a motion to stay this action 283 . The hearing set for July 21, 2015, at 10:30 AM on Suzuki Defendants' renewed motion to permit the sale of real property 253 is vacated. The court defers consideratio n of the motion to permit sale until after there is a disposition of the Suzuki's motion to stay the action or until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 7/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER Granting 268 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Oppose Plaintiff's 255 MOTION to Certify Class . Opposition now due by 8/19/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER that the parties must file a proposed stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order on or before June 12, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER. The Suzukis motion to dismiss, joined by Sterling Escrow, is GRANTED in part as to plaintiffs claim of actual fraudulent transfer. It is DENIED in all other respects. Should plaintiffs wish to pursue a claim of actual fraudulent transfer, they shall have to and including May 26, 2015, in which to amend their complaint to properly state a claim of actual fraudulent transfer as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 9(b). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/10/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER Denying 213 Motion to Compel. Defendants are jointly and severally sanctioned in the amount of $1,500.00, to be paid at the end of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Finance - SLR)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER that 198 Emergency Motion Under Local Rule 7-5 For Order Clarifying October 17, 2014 Order is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/30/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting 191 Unopposed Emergency Motion Under Local Rule 7-5 For Order Clarifying Preliminary Injunction Order To Release Bank Account. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER on 133 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER - Plaintiffs shall respond to the Suzuki defendant's notice 154 on or before Wednesday, July 30, 2014. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 7/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Denying 148 Defendants' Motion to Disqualify. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 150 Defendants' Motion for Order to Show Cause is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 7/18/2014 hearing is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 167 Defendants' Motion to Continue District Judge Hearing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Granting 164 Motion to Continue Magistrate Judge Hearing re 148 Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2014 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Denying as moot 102 and 105 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 86 Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 06/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER that Plaintiffs shall have until 5/27/2014 to file a Third Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court DEFERS consideration of 133 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction until the filing of the Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 05/06/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Overruling as moot 111 Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 01/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER that 106 and 108 Motions to Stay are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 123 Motion to Compel is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 127 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Granting 8 and 70 MOTIONS for Preliminary Injunction as to defendants MRI and Edwin Fujinana as officer of MRI. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/12/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that no later than 4:00 p.m., on 7/18/2013, counsel for plaintiffs shall separately certify in writing any efforts made to give the adverse parties notice of their motion for temporary restraining order and the reasons why notice should not be required. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 7/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Takiguchi et al v. MRI International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin J Fujinaga
Represented By: Erick M Ferran
Represented By: Daniel L. Hitzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRI International, Inc.
Represented By: Erick M Ferran
Represented By: Daniel L. Hitzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junzo Suzuki
Represented By: Paul J Georgeson
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Musashi Suzuki
Represented By: Paul J Georgeson
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaoruko Koizumi
Represented By: Peter M. Angulo
Represented By: Robert W. Cohen
Represented By: James E. Gibbons
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Steven J. Renick
Represented By: Mariko Taenaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fumi Nonaka
Represented By: Peter M. Angulo
Represented By: Robert W. Cohen
Represented By: James E. Gibbons
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Steven J. Renick
Represented By: Mariko Taenaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatsuro Sakai
Represented By: Peter M. Angulo
Represented By: Robert W. Cohen
Represented By: James E. Gibbons
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Steven J. Renick
Represented By: Mariko Taenaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yozo Skiki
Represented By: Peter M. Angulo
Represented By: Robert W. Cohen
Represented By: James E. Gibbons
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Steven J. Renick
Represented By: Mariko Taenaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shige Takiguchi
Represented By: Peter M. Angulo
Represented By: Robert W. Cohen
Represented By: James E. Gibbons
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Steven J. Renick
Represented By: Mariko Taenaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsuaki Takita
Represented By: Peter M. Angulo
Represented By: Robert W. Cohen
Represented By: James E. Gibbons
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Steven J. Renick
Represented By: Mariko Taenaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?