Bradley v. Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Petitioner: Carl Bradley
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2013cv01196
Filed: July 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER that 76 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The petition is DISMISSED with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. All other motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 86 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re: 76 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 8/1/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 83 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re: 76 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 7/27/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 79 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re: 76 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/7/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Clarification. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall file a response to the amended petition, including potentially a motion to dismiss, within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order, with any requests for re lief by petitioner by motion otherwise being subject to the normal briefing schedule under the local rules. Any response filed shall comply with the remaining provisions below, which are entered pursuant to Habeas Rule 5. FURTHER ORDERED that petitio ner shall have sixty (60) days from service of the answer, motion to dismiss, or other response to file a reply or opposition, with any other requests for relief by respondents by motion otherwise being subject to the normal briefing schedule under the local rules. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER that within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order, respondents file and serve an answer to the petition. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall file his reply, if any, within thirty (30) days of the date that the answer is filed. FURTHER ORDERED that 70 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Petition due by 8/28/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Amended Petition due by 7/28/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 62 Motion to Extend Time to File. Amended Petition due by 5/30/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Motion for Leave to serve Subpoenas. (See Order for Details) Amended Petition due by 5/15/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that 38 Motion to Compel and 41 Amended Motion for Discovery are denied without prejudice. The Court sets a status conference for October 18, 2016 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Motion for Discovery until 2/12/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that the Clerk shall electronically serve the Federal Public Defendant with a copy of this Order, together with a copy of 11 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and 16 Motion for Discovery. The FPD shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order to file a notice of appearance or to indicate to the court its inability to represent Petitioner in these proceedings. FURTHER ORDERED that if the FPD files its notice of appearance on behalf of Petitioner, within thi rty (30) days after appearing, the FPD SHALL FILE an amended motion for discovery in conformance with Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Habeas Cases. Such motion shall then be subject to the normal briefing cycle set forth in the local rules. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 11 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attorney General of the State of Nevada answer due 10/6/2014; Federal Bureau of Prisons answer due 10/6/2014; J. E. Thomas answer due 10/6/2014. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/16/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that 15 Motion to Withdraw 9 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that 8 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Petition is GRANTED. The clerk shall file the amended petiton and add the additional respondents named in the amended petition. FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days of entry of this order respondent s shall file a response to 9 Motion to Seal, with petitioner's reply due within 30 days of service of the response. FURTHER ORDERED that within 60 days of entry of this order respondents shall file a response directed only to the issue of t imeliness, including petitoner's claim of actual innocence as it pertains to the time-bar issue. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have 30 days from service of the response as to timeliness to file an opposition to any motion to dismiss filed. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the Clerk shall file the original petition and that petitioner shall have 30 days to file an amended petition. The petitioner shall clearly title the amended petition as an amended petition. The Clerk shall send petitioner two blank copies of a noncapital §2254 petition form together with one copy of the instructions for the form and one copy of the original petition. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/22/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carl Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?