Bank of America, N.A. v. Rob and Robbie, LLC

Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Rob and Robbie, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv01241
Filed: July 12, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Defendant Rob and Robbie, LLC shall have until July 25, 2016, to file a stipulation to dismiss, or a joint status report advising when the stipulation to dismiss will be filed. (Re ECF No. 46 Notice.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 19, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel to file a Joint Pretrial Order by 5/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 9, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERORDERED that the trial date currently set for 9:00 a.m., April 18, 2016, is VACATED and CONTINUED to 9:00 a.m., July 11, 2016, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Calendar call which is currently scheduled for 10:00 a.m., April 11, 2016, is VACATED and CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m., July 5, 2016, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 17, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the trial date is set for 9:00 a.m., April 18, 2016, with calendar call at 10:00 a.m., April 11, 2016 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 9, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at 6/11/15 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 18, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the stay in this case shall expire no later than May 7, 2015. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 23, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 15 Motion to Substitute Plaintiff is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 14 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the case is STAYED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/23/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 16, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Third Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Rob and Robbie, LLC, to File Its Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and to Continue Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Substitute Plaintiff and Amend Caption 21 is GRAN TED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file a Response to the Motion for Summary Judgment on or before June 13, 2014. FURTHER ORDERED that NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS will be granted without a statement of reason for the extension requested. FUR THER ORDERED that the hearing currently set for 09:00 A.M., on THURSDAY, APRIL 17, 2014, in LAS VEGAS COURTROOM, before District Judge Robert C. Jones is VACATED. This matter will be considered and decided without a hearing. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/16/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 15, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Trial Date in this matter is set for August 12, 2014, at 9:00 a.m., with Calendar Call on August 4, 2014, at 1:30 p.m., before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Rob and Robbie, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Kevin S. Soderstrom
Represented By: Gregory L Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob and Robbie, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?