US Bank, NA v. Recovery Services Northwest, Inc.,
Plaintiff: US Bank, NA
Defendant: Custom Recovery and Recovery Services Northwest, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01254
Filed: July 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiff US Bank, NA and against Defendant Recovery Services Northwest, Inc. in the amount of $235,919.87. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's 152 Motion for Attorney's Fees. On or before 12/8/2017 U.S. Bank shall advise the court whether it still seeks sanctions in the form of fees against Wait. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Granting Eugene Wait's 154 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Recovery Services Northwest, Inc. Recovery Services Northwest, Inc. has until 4/11/2017 to obtain new counsel and advise the Court of the same. The Clerk of the Court shall add the last known address of Recovery Services Northwest, Inc. to the civil docket (see Order for address). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Order mailed to Recovery Services Northwest, Inc. - SLD)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Defendant Custom Recovery shall pay Plaintiff U.S. Bank attorneys' fees (including paralegal fees) in the amount of $27,688.57 and costs in the amount of $1,374.60 for a total of $29,063.17. Defendant is ordered to make the payment to Plaintiff by 4/6/2017. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 85 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery. Counsel for Plaintiff shall no later than 15 days from entry of this order serve and file a memorandum establishing the amount of attorney's fees and costs incurred (see Order for Reply and Response deadlines). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 100 Motion to Extend Time (Second Request). The deadline to file Dispositive Motions and to file Responses to 81 Motion for Summary Judgment and 82 Renewed Motion for Judicial Notice shall be 30 days after a ruling on Plaintiff's 85 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 94 Motion to Strike Defendant's 93 Memorandum of Issues for Hearing. The Clerk of the Court is directed to strike Defendant' s 93 Memorandum of Issues for Hearing from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 87 Motion to Extend Time (First Request). The deadline to file Dispositive Motions and to file Responses to 81 Motion for Summary Judgment and 82 Renewed Motion for Judicial Notice is 9/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Denying without prejudice Defendant's 61 Motion for Judicial Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. Discovery due by 6/30/2016. Motions due by 7/30/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER that Plaintiff's 53 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions is Granted. Defendant's 56 Motion for Leave to Serve Pre-Trial Rule 36 Requests for Admission of Facts and Genuineness of Documents is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying Defendant Custom Recovery's 30 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that the following discovery plan and scheduling order dates shall apply: Discovery due by 3/29/2016. Motions due by 4/28/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that Defendant Recovery Services Northwest, Inc.'s 24 Motion to Dismiss is Granted as to U.S. Bank's third cause of action for fraud but Denied as to all of U.S. Bank's other claims. U.S. Bank may amend its complaint within 30 days of entry of this Order if sufficient facts exist to support its proposed fraud claim. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 7 Motion to Dismiss and 11 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. US Bank has 30 days from the entry of this Order to file an Amended Complaint. If US Bank fails to meet this deadline, the Court will dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Bank, NA v. Recovery Services Northwest, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Recovery
Represented By: Eugene J Wait, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recovery Services Northwest, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene J Wait, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank, NA
Represented By: Ryan A. Loosvelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?