United States of America et al v. Healthsouth Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Luke and United States of America
Defendant: Kenneth Bowman, Jerry Gray, Healthsouth Corporation, Healthsouth of Henderson, Inc. and Jaya Patel
Case Number: 2:2013cv01319
Filed: July 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting in part 255 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1; and otherwise affirming 253 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 260 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 4/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 254 CLERK'S JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER Granting 245 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 242 Motion for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 1/15/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER Granting 236 Motion to Extend Deadlines re Motion for Attorney's Fees and to File a Bill of Costs. Realtor has until 12/27/2019 to move for attorney's fees and to file a bill of costs. Defendants have up to and including 12/27/2019 to file objections to a bill of costs. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER Re: 227 Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. The parties are Granted an additional 28 day stay of the case deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER Granting 224 Second Joint Stipulation. All deadlines are suspended as set forth in the Special Master's Order. The parties shall report back on the status of the settlement within 28 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Special Master David M. Tenner on 8/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER Granting 223 Stipulation to Vacate Hearing re 215 Objections to Special Master Order. Within 28 days of the entry of this order the Parties shall report back to the Court on the status of the settlement discussions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER Granting 219 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time re Discovery re 213 Order (First Request). Signed by Special Master David M. Tenner on 8/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's 161 Motion to Compel and 179 Joint Proposed Revised Scheduling Order. The parties are directed to file a Stipulated Revised Scheduling Order or in the absence of a Stipulated Order, a Status Report by 9/10/2019. Signed by Special Master David M. Tenner on 7/19/2019 (nunc pro tunc 7/10/2019). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 AMENDED ORDER Granting 199 Joint Motion for Leave to Participate Telephonically at 6/6/2019 Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Granting 189 Joint Stipulation Concerning the Appointment of a Special Master. David M. Tenner is appointed as Special Master. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Main Document 198 replaced on 5/22/2019) (SLD).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Granting 191 Joint Motion to Extend Time to File a Revised Proposed Order re Appointment of Special Master. Deadline: 5/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Re: 182 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER that a Hearing to discuss the appointment of a Special Mater to oversee the completion of discovery in this case is scheduled for 5/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Counsel for the parties must consult with Ronald J. Hedges and any alternative Special Master candidates regarding potential appointment and if possible submit by noon, 5/7/2019 a proposed stipulation and order appointing a special master. The Clerk of Court is directed to email a copy of this order to Mr. Hedges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Granting 176 First Stipulation to Extend Time re 174 Minutes of Proceedings. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER that a hearing on the Motion to Compel Responses to Relator'sSecond Requests for Production (ECF No. 161 ) and Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Case Deadlines in the Scheduling Order (ECF No. 164 ) is scheduled for 10:00 AM, February 27, 2019, in Courtroom3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Granting 149 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 132 First Amended Complaint. Healthsouth Corporation and Healthsouth of Henderson, Inc.'s answer due 7/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Granting Defendants' 133 and 134 Motions to Dismiss. Relator Joshua Luke may file an Amended Complaint by 7/27/2018. Defendants' 146 Objections are Overruled and Defendants' 147 Emergency Motion to Stay is Denied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 135 Stipulation to Reschedule Hearing. Supplemental Briefing due by 5/23/2018. The Hearing re: 104 Motion for Protective Order is rescheduled to 6/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting 130 Stipulation to Reschedule Hearing on Defendant's 104 Motion for Protective Order. Oral Argument on the Motion is set for 5/24/2018 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re: 124 Motion to Stay. ORDERED that all discovery is stayed until further order of the court. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file on April 29, 2018 simultaneous briefs supplementing their arguments regarding the Motion for Protecti ve Order (ECF No. 104 ), taking into account ECF No. 127 and any amended complaint filed in accordance with that order. FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on the Motion to Stay (ECF No. 124 ) and Motion for Protective Order (ECF No. 104 ) is scheduled for 10:00 AM, May 18, 2018, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Granting Defendants' 59 and 60 Motions to Dismiss. Defendants' 58 Motion to Dismiss is Denied as moot. Relator Joshua Luke shall file an amended complaint on or before 4/9/2018. Failure to do so will result in the closure of this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Granting 108 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 104 Motion for Protective Order. Defendants' Replies due by 1/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER that any opposition to Realtor Joshua Luke's Motion to Stay and to Clarify the court's Order Disqualifying Troutman Sanders, LLP (ECF No. 88 ) must be filed on or before October 13, 2017. Any reply in support of Realtor Joshua Lu kes Motion to Stay and to Clarify the court's Order Disqualifying Troutman Sanders, LLP (ECF No. 88 ) must be filed on or before October 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re Defendants Healthsouth Corporation and Healthsouth of Henderson Inc.'s 66 Motion to Disqualify Troutman Sanders LLP, 67 Motion to Stay Discovery, and 68 Motion for Protective Order. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 74 Stipulation to Move Date of Discovery Hearing. ( Discovery Hearing reset for 9/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 69 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery Hearing set for 9/7/2017 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 61 Stipulation re 58 , 59 , and 60 Motions to Dismiss. Dr. Luke is permitted to file a single consolidated opposition in one brief limited to no more than 38 pages and (2) Defendants are permitted to file a single consolidated reply brief limited to no more than 19 pages. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that the 1 Complaint and the Government's 34 Notice of Election to Decline Intervention is unsealed. All other contents in this action remain under seal. The seal is to be lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Roger Wenthe - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Healthsouth Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthsouth Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthsouth of Henderson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaya Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Luke
Represented By: Kevin J Kieffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin J Kieffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?