Nevada Association Services, Inc. v. Yanke et al
Plaintiff: |
Nevada Association Services, Inc. |
Defendant: |
California Reconveyance Company, City of Las Vegas, Estates at Seven Hills Owner's Association, Real Equity Pursuit, LLC, Republic Services Inc., United States of America, Washington Mutual Bank. F.A., Kathy Clay Yanke and Rodney J. Yanke |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv01386 |
Filed: |
August 5, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
Taxes |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Ti |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 16, 2015 |
Filing
103
ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Finance - MMM)
|
December 23, 2014 |
Filing
91
JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America (Internal Revenue Service). Final Judgment is hereby entered, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), in favor of the IRS in the amount of $22,897.45, as set forth in the Court's September 16 2014 Order, ECF 85 and the United States is DISMISSED from this action. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/23/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 17, 2014 |
Filing
86
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Nevada Association Services, Inc. against Estates at Seven Hills Owner's Association, Real Equity Pursuit, LLC, and Kathy Clay Yanke, pursuant to Order # 85 entered 9/17/14. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 9/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
85
ORDER that 83 Motion for Disbursement of Funds is GRANTED, and the Clerk shall DISBURSE $22,897.45 from the Funds to the United States. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall GRANT the Motion for Default Judgment 66 and enter judgment in accordance therewith. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/16/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Finance - MMM)
|
July 23, 2014 |
Filing
84
ORDER that 75 Motion for Disbursement of Funds is GRANTED in part, and the Clerk shall DISBURSE $1170.17 from the Funds to Republic Services, Inc. FURTHER ORDERED that 76 Motion for Attorney's Fees and to be Dismissed as a Party is GRANTED in part. Attorney's fees and costs are denied, but Plaintiff is DISMISSED as a party. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/23/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
April 17, 2014 |
Filing
70
ORDER that 51 Motion to Deposit Funds is GRANTED, and the state court shall either RELEASE the Funds to Nevada Association Services, Inc., or, alternatively, TRANSFER the Funds to the registry of this Court. FURTHER ORDERED that 12 Motion to Di smiss Counterclaim is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 17 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 55 Motion to Disburse Funds is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 59 Motion to Disburse Funds is GRANTED, and the Clerk shall, upon deposit of the Funds, DISBURSE to the City of Las Vegas $302.60 from the Funds before making any other disbursements therefrom. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Finance - MMM)
|
January 10, 2014 |
Filing
56
ORDER that 4 Motion for Leave to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?