McGee v. Donahoe
Plaintiff: Lola McGee
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Case Number: 2:2013cv01426
Filed: August 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER that Plaintiff's 224 Second Motion to Compel, 226 Motion for Sanctions re Scheduling Order and 241 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery are DENIED. Defendants' 231 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and 239 Motion for Summary Judgment are GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and close the case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER Denying Plaintiff Lola McGee's 215 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default and 216 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER that 129 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 106 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER that 159 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff and 162 Motion to Remove Current Counsel from her Case and Reference Plaintiff's New Address are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER that a Hearing re 115 Motion for Clarification or Reconsideration is set for 6/24/2016 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER that 112 Request for Transcripts is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER that 90 Motion for Court Order and Sanctions is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 91 Motion to Expedite is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 93 Motion to Compel is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Brennan will subpoena Dr. Jenkins for a deposition. McGee will be allowed to question Dr. Jenkins for twenty minutes, and Brennan will be allowed ten minutes of follow-up. Brennan will pay Dr. Jenkins' $500 witness fee. FURTHER ORDERED that McGee take Dr. Jenkins' deposi tion on or before July 8, 2016. FURTHER ORDERED that McGee's response to Brennan's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 106 ) is due by August 5, 2016. Brennan's reply will be due in the ordinary course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER that a Hearing re 101 Motion to Retract and 103 Motion Retract Plaintiff's Motion ECF #101 is scheduled for 5/20/2016 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING 96 Motion to Retract : The clerk is directed to strike docket # 92 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER that a Hearing re 86 Motion for Accommodation is scheduled for 3/4/2016 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER that a Hearing re 81 Motion to Remove Nelson Law/Sharon Nelson as Attorney of Record is scheduled for 3/4/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER that a Hearing re 78 Motion for Extension of Time is set for 3/4/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that the Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to remove the undersigned as the settlement judge and remove the ENE flag from CM/ECF in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 68 Motion to Extend Time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for 11:00 a.m., December 15, 2015 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER that the parties file, no later than December 15, 2015, a joint status report indicating whether they believe an ENE would be fruitful at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER that a Hearing re 68 Motion for Extension of Time is set for 12/15/2015 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. FURTHER ORDERED that any opposition to 68 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time must be filed on or before December 7, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 Motion for a Copy of the Transcript of the 9/11/15 Motion Hearing and Oral Arguments. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that all discovery is stayed in this case until the earlier of twenty (20) days after a ruling on 18 Motion to Dismiss or February 5, 2016. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties will not be required to file a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order until the earlier of twenty (20) days after a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss or February 5, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 41 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery is STAYED up to July 15, 2015 or until the District Court decides Defendants Motion to Dismiss, whichever occurs first. In the event Defendants Motion to Dismiss is not granted in its entirety, the parties MUST file a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order within twenty days of the courts decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/10/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that 33 Motion to Stay is GRANTED. Discovery is STAYED for four months or until the District Court adjudicates Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, whichever comes first. FURTHER ORDERED that 36 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically is GRANTED with provisions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/30/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that the court's September 24, 2014 hearing is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying 27 Plaintiff Lola McGee's Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Re: Early Neutral Evaluation Session. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/29/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Accepting and Adopting 7 Report and Recommendation. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. The Clerk shall file the Complaint and Amended Complaint. The clerk shall issue summons to the defendants named in the Amended Complaint, deliver same to the US Marshal for service and send blank copies of the USM-285 forms to Plaintiff. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have 20 days to furnish to the US Marshal the required USM-285 forms. FURTHER ORDERED that 10 MOTION for Order to Serve Complaint is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/26/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; blank USM 285 forms to plaintff - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lola McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?