Mellor v. West Trop Storage, LLC
Plaintiff: Eli Mellor
Defendant: West Trop Storage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv01502
Filed: August 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER dismissing 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re 76 Order on Mandate. Motion to Amended Complaint deadline: 28 days from date of this Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Denying 61 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 65 Request for Privacy, which is construed as a Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Denying 39 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs motions for summary judgment 28 , for sanctions 40 , for district judge to reconsider pretrial order 41 , for emergency continuanc e of trial date 51 , and to strike defendants motions in limine 52 are DENIED as moot. Defendants motions in limine 46 , 47 , 48 are DENIED as moot. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 4/2/2014. Granting in part and Denying in part 18 Motion for Sanctions. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Preston S. Kerr via email and mail - SLR)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for plaintiff by Preston S Kerr. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Eli Mellor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mellor v. West Trop Storage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Mellor
Represented By: Preston S Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Trop Storage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?