Edwards v. Clark County et al

Defendant: Clark County, Michael Dilorenzo, Eagle Quest, Inc., Tracy Kingera, Stacey Steinbrecher, Tomiseth and Michael Yohey
Plaintiff: Carl Dean Edwards
Case Number: 2:2013cv01530
Filed: August 22, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT is HEREBY ORDERED that Edward's case is dismissed with prejudice for his failure to fie an amended complaint. The clerk of court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 19, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk of Court shall file Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend by 4/18/2014. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel 2 is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 15, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 8 Objection to Report and Recommendation is SUSTAINED. The 7 Report and Recommendation is REJECTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Amended Complaint deadline due 5/4/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Clark County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dilorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Quest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Kingera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Steinbrecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomiseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Yohey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Dean Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.