Guarantee Company of North America USA v. Barajas et al
Plaintiff: Guarantee Company of North America USA
Defendant: Anthony Barajas, Elizabeth Barajas and Barajas Family Trust dated 05/25/10
Case Number: 2:2013cv01583
Filed: August 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the stay is lifted and THIS CASE IS DISMISSED inits entirety. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE THIS CASE. (See order for details.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff, The Guarantee Company of North America has until 3/3/16, to show cause. If Plaintiff does not file a document showing good cause by 3/3/16, this case will be dismissed in its entirety without further notice and without prejudice. (See order for details.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that all parties shall appear for a Motion Hearing re 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 10/2/2013 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Defendants Responses to 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 9/20/2013. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/4/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guarantee Company of North America USA v. Barajas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Barajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Barajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barajas Family Trust dated 05/25/10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guarantee Company of North America USA
Represented By: Colin R. Chipman
Represented By: Kurt C Faux
Represented By: Gregory M Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?