Securities and Exchange Commission v. Fujinaga et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: CSA Service Center, LLC, Edwin Yoshihiro Fujinaga and MRI International, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01658
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 556 the receiver's motion for order to show cause why former counsel for defendant should not be compelled to return estate funds be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED tha t the parties shall appear in the United States District Court, Courtroom 6A, on Tuesday, 6/30/20, at 11:30 a.m. to show cause why the firm should not be held in contempt. The court has set aside one hour for this hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to appear and show cause will result in sanctions. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER Granting 564 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 556 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Responses due by 4/21/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 543 the receiver's motion for order approving and authorizing payment of receiver's and professionals' fees and expenses be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 543 the receiver's motion for order granting relief from Local Rule 66-5 pertaining to notice to creditors be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Yunju Trust must file a notice with its current address with the court by 6/14/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 461 the receiver's motion for order approving and authorizing payment of receiver's and professionals' fees be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [46 1] the receiver's motion for an order finding notice to creditors to be sufficient under Local Rule 66-5 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER Granting 475 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 464 Motion. Responses due by 1/16/2018. This order supersedes 472 the parties' stipulation which is hereby DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER Granting 471 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Counsel. Attorney Richard E. Simpson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/9/2018.; (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 459 plaintiff's motion to admit Sarah Heaton Concannon to practice in the District of Nevada be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that SEC attorney Sarah Heaton Concannon be admitted to practice before this Court during the duration of her employment with the United States. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER Granting 460 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Kevin P. O'Rourke withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 452 Michael V. Cristalli's motion to withdraw as counsel of record is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Relief Defendant The Yunju Trust must retain a new attorney and file a notice of appearance no later than 11/30/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 437 the motion to approve the sale of real property, personal property, and for relief from the notice requirements of Local Rule 66-5 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver shall file with this court within seven (7) days a proposed order as referenced in its filings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the receiver shall, within seven (7) days, submit to the court for in camera rev iew copies of: the appraisal performed by Tammy L. Howard and Matthew J. Lubway, the appraisal performed by W. Snow, and the written opinion of Greg Clemens as to the value of the property. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 441 the receiver's motion for order approving and authorizing payment of receiver's and professionals' fees be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [4 41] the receiver's motion for an order finding notice to creditors to be sufficient under Local Rule 66-5 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 423 the receiver's motion for order approving and authorizing payment of receiver's and professionals fees (ECF No. 423) be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 423 the receiver's motion for an order finding notice to creditors to be sufficient under Local Rule 66-5 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 415 the receiver's motion for order approving and authorizing payment of receiver's and professionals' fees be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [4 15] the receiver's motion for an order finding notice to creditors to be sufficient under Local Rule 66-5 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER Granting 419 Stipulation Authorizing the Sale of Personal Property at Auction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER Granting 403 Motion to Authorize and Direct the Receiver to Release Settlement Funds. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 406 the motion to admit be, and by the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that SEC attorney Kevin P. ORourke be admitted to practice before this Court during the duration of his employment by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER Granting 374 Motion for Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER Granting 379 Motion for Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER that 376 the receiver's Motion for order approving and authorizing payment of receiver's and professionals' fees is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 376 the receiver's Motion for an order finding notice to creditors to be sufficient under Local Rule 66-5 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER Granting 365 Motion for Order (1) Authorizing, Approving and Confirming Sale of Real Property Located at 150 E Harmon and Sale of Overbid Procedures and for Related Reief; (2) Authorizing Sale of Personal Property via Auction, and (3) Granting Relief from Local Rule 66-5 Pertaining to Notice to Creditors. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 370 relief defendant June Fujinaga's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 331 receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC's motion for order compelling defendant Edwin Fujinaga to appear and show cause why he should not be held in contempt of court be, and the sa me hereby is, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 356 relief defendant June Fujinaga's motion for leave to file state complaint be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 358 relief defendant's motion for approval of budget and release of funds be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff SEC's motion for order directing defendant and relief defendant to vacate property and provide assistance to effectuate transfer of property be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 352 the receiver's motion for order approving and authorizing payment of receiver's and professionals' fees be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [ 352] the receiver's motion for an order finding notice to creditors to be sufficient under Local Rule 66-5 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER Denying Defendant Edwin Yoshihiro Fujinaga's 295 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 07/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER Granting 337 Motion for an order approving and authorizing payment of fees. FURTHER ORDERED that the receiver's motion for an order finding notice to creditors to be sufficient under Local Rule 66-5 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER Authorizing, Approving, and Confirming the Hoy's Settlement Agreement regarding 327 Order on Motion. (See order for details.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER that 305 Motion For Order Authorizing, Approving and Confirming Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release, and Granting Relief from Local Rule 66-5 Pertaining to Notice to Creditors is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the receiver shall submit a proposed order within seven days of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER Granting 307 Motion for an Order Authorizing the Receiver to List and Market for Sale the Real Property Located at 150 E. Harmon and Granting Relief from Local Rule 66-5 Pertaining to Notice to Creditors. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the receivers motion for an order approving and authorizing payment of fees, 313 , be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the receivers motion for an order finding notice to creditors to be sufficient under Local Rule 66-5, 313 , be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 317 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT against Relief Defendants June Fujinaga and the Yunju Trust. Relief Defendants June Fujinaga and The Yunju Trust shall be jointly and severally liable to pay disgorgement in the amount of $2,333,382.18. This Court shall re tain jurisdiction of this action for the purposes of enforcing the terms of this Final Judgment. The Clerk is ordered to enter this Final Judgment forthwith and without further notice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER Granting 300 Stipulation Authorizing, Approving and Confirming Sale of 2865 Coleman with Overbid Procedures. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER Granting 284 Motion for an Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Fees and for an Order Finding Notice to Creditor to be Sufficient Under Local Rule 66-5. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER Granting 271 Stipulation for Disposition of Medications by Receiver. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER Granting Final Judgment Against Relief Defendants June Fujinaga and the Junju Trust regarding 257 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER Granting Receiver's 244 Motion for an Order approving and authorizing payment of fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Receiver's 245 Motion for an Order finding Notice to Creditor's to be Sufficient is Granted. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER Granting 219 SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER Appointing a Full Equitable Receiver to Assume Control over the Defendants' Assets and enforce the Final Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDERED that the receiver shall solicit bid proposals for the position of counsel to the receiver, and submit these proposals directly to this Courts chambers no later than June 1, 2015 at 3 p.m. Ordered that following submission of the bid proposals, the receiver shall await further order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER re 212 Status Report filed by Rob Evans & Associates LLC. The parties shall appear for a hearing on Friday, May 15, 2015, at 10:00 am, in courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Any objections to the receivers report shall be filed with the court by May 8, 2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER denying 196 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Denying 205 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting 199 Stipulation to extend deadline to reply to 198 RESPONSE to 196 OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider 188 Order. Replies due by 4/15/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re 191 Motion Rule 54(b) Certification. The Court hereby CERTIFIES that there is no just reason for delay, pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, in the appeal and enforcement of the Judgment, and the Judgment shall be a Final Judgment as against Defendants Edwin Fujinaga and MRI International, Inc., forthwith and without further notice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER appointing Rob Evans & Associates LLC as equitable receiver. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting 178 Motion for Judgment. Defendants shall be jointly and severally liable for disgorgement of proceeds in the amount of $442,229,611.70 and prejudgment interest in the amount of $102,129,752.38. Defendants shall also be liable for civil money penalties of $20,000,000.00 each. Defendants are hereby permanently enjoined from any further securities violations. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties meet and confer, and submit a revised, proposed stipulated order pursuant to the Courts discussion in this order. The parties shall submit the proposed order to this Court no later than December 16, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the SECs motion for briefing schedule on remedies, 167 , is GRANTED insofar as it seeks a briefing schedule, but DENIED insofar as it asks the court to adopt the briefing schedule proposed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall brief the issue of remedies pursuant to the courts briefing schedule as detailed. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 163 Motion to Approve Payment of the Invoice of Accounting Firm Gilmore & Gilmore. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue a check in the amount of $5,000, payable to Gilmore & Gilmore, from the Registry Account of the Court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/5/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc USDC Finance TR)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 154 Motion for an order approving payment of the Fifth invoice of Court-Appointed Accounting Firm McGladrey LLP and approval of payment to McGladrey of $36,312.50 for 112.3 hours of work. ORDERED that the Cl erk of the Court shall issue a check in the amount of $36,312.50, payable to McGladrey LLP, from the Registry Account of the Court in particular, from the cash deposited by the parties into the Registry Account on July 14, 2014 and July 21, 2014 pursuant to the order of the Court dated July 3, 2014 107 . Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 128 Motion to approve payment of the Fourth Invoice of Court- Appointed Accounting Firm McGladrey LLP. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 98 Motion to admit David S. Johnson to practice in the District of Nevada. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that United States Securities and Exchange Commission attorney David S. Johnson be admitted to practice before this court during the duration of his employment with the United States. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 109 Defendant/Relief-Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees, and in light of the circumstances of the case and the factors considered, the sum of $200,000.00 as and for reasonable attorneys' fees is hereby released to the law firm of Hitzke & Associates. ORDERED that the asset freeze entered 10/7/2013, shall be lifted only to enable the release of the aforementioned attorneys' fees to Hitzke & Associates. This sum shall be paid from the Claims Servicing of America, LLC account, account number XXXXXXX0712 at Bank of Las Vegas, or shall be released to Hitzke & Associates from the Court Registry Account if the SEC's Motion to Deposit Funds Into Court Registry Account is granted. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 95 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Approving Payment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 05/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting 78 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Approving Payment of the Second Invoice of Court-Appointed Accounting Firm McGladrey LLP. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 05/05/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting 72 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Approving Payment of the First Invoice of Court-Appointed Accounting Firm. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 04/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 65 Motion for Order Approving the Engagement Letter of Court-Appointed Accounting Firm McGladrey LLP. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 04/03/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED ORDER Granting 51 Plaintiff's Motion for the Appointment of an Accountant. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 03/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 40 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/27/2014 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants and the relief defendant and, at her discretion, June Fujinaga, shall deliver via email to counsel for plaintiff, James A. Kidney, any papers opposing the entry of an order as described no later than 2/14/14, 5:00 p.m. Pacific Standard Time. The Commission shall have until 2/20/14, 5:00 p.m. Pacific Standard Time, to serve via email on counsel for the defendants and for June Fujinaga any reply papers. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that sanctions, including monetary sanctions and a recommendation for civil contempt, shall not be imposed on Blaine T. Welsh, Gerald W. Hodgkins, Gregory G. Faragasso, Richard E. Simpson, and Robert I. Dodge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 01/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Motion for Leave to Appear as Government Attorney for Attorney James A Kidney for Securities and Exchange Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/14/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. FURTHER ORDERED that the Hearing scheduling for Tuesday, October 15, 2013, at 11:00 am is VACATED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 12 Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal the record as to all filings in this case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 09/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: AUSA and Counsel - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Fujinaga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSA Service Center, LLC
Represented By: Erick M Ferran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Yoshihiro Fujinaga
Represented By: Erick M Ferran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRI International, Inc.
Represented By: Erick M Ferran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Robert I. Dodge
Represented By: Danette R. Edwards
Represented By: Gregory G. Faragasso
Represented By: Gerald W. Hodgkins
Represented By: Richard E. Simpson
Represented By: Thomas C. Swiers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?