United States of America v. FVS Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: FVS Holdings, Inc. doing business as Green Valley Drugs and Scot Silber
Case Number: 2:2013cv01665
Filed: September 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Forfeiture and Penalty - Food and Drug Acts
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to SCOT SILBER by Defendant Scot Silber (Zirzow, Matthew)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 37 Stipulation to Dismiss with prejudice. The Motion to Dismiss #8 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 11, 2014 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff United States of America. (Wenthe, Roger)
February 10, 2014 Filing 23 (2nd Notice) NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109: that Noah E. Jussim is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Continued failure to abide by Special Order 109 will be brought to the Judges attention for appropriate action. Please visit the Courts website www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select ATTORNEY REGISTRATION located in the middle of the web page to register.(no image attached) (RFJ)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #21 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/12/2014. Motions due by 6/11/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 30, 2013 Filing 21 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff United States of America . (Wenthe, Roger)
December 10, 2013 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #18 Reply to Response to Motion, #19 Certificate of Interested Parties, by Defendants FVS Holdings, Inc., Scot Silber. (Noall, William)
December 9, 2013 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by FVS Holdings, Inc., Scot Silber that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case, Green Valley Drugs, Green Valley Medical Supply, Green Valley Drugs Home Health, Green Valley Med, University Specialty Pharmacy for FVS Holdings, Inc. added. (Noall, William)
December 6, 2013 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants FVS Holdings, Inc., Scot Silber. (Noall, William)
December 5, 2013 Filing 17 (1st Notice) NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109: that Noah E. Jussim is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Courts website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select ATTORNEY REGISTRATION located in the middle of the web page to register.(no image attached) (RFJ)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that Defendants shall file their Certificate of Interested Parties by 12/16/2013. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 26, 2013 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Replies due by 12/6/2013. (Wenthe, Roger)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Noah E. Jussim and approving Attorney William M. Noall as Designation of Local Counsel for Defendants FVS Holdings, Inc. and Scot Silber. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/22/2013. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 21, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #3 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by NOAH E. JUSSIM and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel WILLIAM M. NOALL (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-3029498) by Defendants FVS Holdings, Inc., Scot Silber. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Noall, William)
November 20, 2013 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, on 11/20/2013. By Judicial Assistant: Cathy Stuchell. RE: #11 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, #3 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by NOAH E. JUSSIM and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel WILLIAM M. NOALL (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-3029498). NOTICE: Attorney Action Required - CORRECTION: Counsel advised to obtain an ACTUAL SIGNATURE from the Party and to refile the Verified Petition, using "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event and link to Docket entries #11 and #3 . Counsel has until November 27, 2013 to remedy the deficiencies. Failure to comply may result in the denial of the petition.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
November 20, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #3 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by NOAH E. JUSSIM and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel WILLIAM M. NOALL (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-3029498) by Defendants FVS Holdings, Inc., Scot Silber. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Noall, William)
November 18, 2013 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #9 Appendix, #5 Proposed Order Submission, #8 MOTION to Dismiss, #4 Stipulation, #3 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by NOAH E. JUSSIM and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel WILLIAM M. NOALL (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-3029498) by Defendants FVS Holdings, Inc., Scot Silber. (Noall, William)
November 15, 2013 Filing 9 APPENDIX to #8 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by Defendants FVS Holdings, Inc., Scot Silber. (Noall, William)
November 15, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants FVS Holdings, Inc., Scot Silber. Responses due by 12/2/2013. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/25/2013. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/30/2013. (Noall, William)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Defendants FVS Holdings, Inc. and Scot Silber answer due 11/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/13/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 13, 2013 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, on 11/13/2013. By Judicial Assistant: Cathy Stuchell. RE: #3 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by NOAH E. JUSSIM and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel WILLIAM M. NOALL (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-3029498). NOTICE: Attorney Action Required - CORRECTION: Counsel advised to attach a Certificate of Good Standing to the Verified Petition, and refile using "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event and link to #3 VERIFIED PETITION. Counsel has until November 27, 2013 to remedy the deficiencies. Failure to comply may result in the denial of the petition.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
November 12, 2013 Filing 5 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #4 Stipulation; filed by Defendants FVS Holdings, Inc., Scot Silber. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
November 12, 2013 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint; filed by Defendants FVS Holdings, Inc., Scot Silber. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
November 12, 2013 Filing 3 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by NOAH E. JUSSIM and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel WILLIAM M. NOALL (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-3029498) by Defendants FVS Holdings, Inc., Scot Silber. Motion ripe 11/12/2013. (Dzarnoski, Mark) Corrected image #11 attached on 11/20/2013 (RFJ). Corrected image #13 attached on 11/21/2013 (RFJ).
September 12, 2013 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service. (no image attached) (MAJ)
September 12, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/22/2013. Proof of service due by 1/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wenthe, Roger)
September 12, 2013 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MAJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. FVS Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Roger Wayne Wenthe
Represented By: Daniel G. Bogden, Govt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FVS Holdings, Inc. doing business as Green Valley Drugs
Represented By: Mark Dzarnoski
Represented By: Noah Jussim
Represented By: William M. Noall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scot Silber
Represented By: Mark Dzarnoski
Represented By: Matthew C Zirzow
Represented By: Noah Jussim
Represented By: William M. Noall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?