Bates et al v. Dollar Loan Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pasquail Bates, Ronald Grider, Sharon Pratt, Erik W. Wahl, Dillyn Warren and Julie Wright
Defendant: CCI Financial, Inc., Cash 1, LLC, Check City Partnership, LLC, Clark County Collection Service, LLC, DLC Empire, LLC, Dollar Loan Center, LLC and Tosh, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01731
Filed: September 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting ECF No. 222 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; and Certification of Settlement Class. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER that all pending motions ( 126 , 191 ) are denied without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER that the Court HEREBY VACATES the evidentiary hearing set for January 21, 2015, and SETS this matter for status check on February 3, 2015 at 9:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER that granting 188 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Class Claims is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 182 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiff Sharon Pratt's Motion for Class Certification is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER that 166 Motion for Leave to File Response is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that an Evidentiary Hearing is set for 12/9/2014 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4A before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Granting 155 Motion to Seal. ORDERED that Defendants response 154 Exhibit B be SEALED. Defendants are HEREBY ORDERED to file redacted versions of the documents for the public record on or before October 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/26/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER that 88 Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 92 Stipulation to Extend Discovery is DENIED. The parties are instructed to submit a new discovery plan by Friday, September 5, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/26/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER that 103 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER that 107 Motion to Seal and 110 Motion to Seal are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/27/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER that 57 Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER. The Court STRIKES 14 , 15 , 16 , 17 , 27 , 28 , 33 , 44 , 45 , 46 , 47 , 48 , 49 , 51 , 69 , 70 , 71 , 73 , 74 , 75 , 79 , 80 , 81 , 82 , 83 , 84 , 85 , 86 . Defendants must file any renewed motion for summary judgment on or before June 11, 2014. Plaintiff's response will be due on or before June 25, 2014. Any reply will be due on or before July 2. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/27/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that 20 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. Cash 1's Motion to Dismiss 18 is HEREBY GRANTED in part only as to Cash 1 and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 52 Unopposed Motion to Seal and File Redacted Exhibits. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates et al v. Dollar Loan Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasquail Bates
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Kelly B Stout
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Grider
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Kelly B Stout
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Pratt
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Kelly B Stout
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik W. Wahl
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Kelly B Stout
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dillyn Warren
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Kelly B Stout
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Wright
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Kelly B Stout
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCI Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash 1, LLC
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Check City Partnership, LLC
Represented By: Krystal J Gallagher
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Collection Service, LLC
Represented By: Krystal J Gallagher
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLC Empire, LLC
Represented By: Krystal J Gallagher
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Loan Center, LLC
Represented By: Krystal J Gallagher
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tosh, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?