McDonagh et al v. Harrah's Las Vegas, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Grucello and Nicole McDonagh
Defendant: Harrah's Entertainment, LLC and Harrah's Las Vegas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01744
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 98 Motion for Attorney Fees and 100 Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. The Court approves enhancement payments of $15,000 each for Nicole McDonagh and David Grucello and $ 5,000 to plaintiff Kimberley Daprizio.The Court confirms the appointment of The Markham Law Firm and Thierman Buck LLP as class counsel and approves their requests for attorney's fees of $212,500 and litigation costs of $31,055.29 . The Court finds that the settlement administrator CPT Group, Inc. is entitled to $18,500 for administrative fees.The Complaint is dismissed with prejudice and the Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement (see Order for additional details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 14, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 87 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Class Counsel shall file its motion for attorneys' fees, costs, and class representative enhancement awards on 11/21/2016. All papers filed in support of final approval of the settlement, and response to any objections will be filed no later than 11/28/2016. Final Approval Hearing set for 12/13/2016 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 11, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a hearing on 87 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of ClassAction Settlement is set for 9/6/2016 at 10:00 a.m. in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. If the parties wish to file briefs on this issue, they must do so by 8/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 11, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 58 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of Exhibt 2 to Menhennet Declaration. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 17, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 21 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's 26 Motion to Certify Class is Granted. The parties shall meet and confer in order to agree on a mutually acceptable notice to be submitted for the court's approval no later than 30 days following the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 12, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss the original Complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonagh et al v. Harrah's Las Vegas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Grucello
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: David R Markham
Represented By: Janine R. Menhennet
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole McDonagh
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: David R Markham
Represented By: Janine R. Menhennet
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrah's Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrah's Las Vegas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?