Smart City Holdings, LLC et al v. Shownets, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Smart City Holdings, LLC and Smart City Networks, L.P. |
Defendant: |
Shownets, LLC and Scott Nussbaum |
Counter Defendant: |
Smart City Holdings, LLC and Smart City Networks, L.P. |
Counter Claimant: |
Shownets, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv01751 |
Filed: |
September 24, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Gloria M. Navarro |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 25, 2014 |
Filing
108
PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/25/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 17, 2014 |
Filing
105
ORDER Granting 104 Joint Motion to Vacate the Status Conference set for 04:00 PM 7/17/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
November 18, 2013 |
Filing
75
PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 74 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
November 6, 2013 |
Filing
67
ORDER Denying 60 Motion to Seal. Defendant Nussbaum shall file an unsealed copy of 61 Motion to Dismiss within 5 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 65 Motion to Seal is granted in part and denied in part. Plainti ff's shall file an unsealed copy of 66 MOTION to Dismiss within 5 days of this order. Plaintiffs shall file unsealed and redacted copies of the exhibits to 66 Motion to Dismiss along with a sealed explanation setting forth adequate reasons for any redaction. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
October 10, 2013 |
Filing
52
ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
October 2, 2013 |
Filing
36
ORDER Granting 21 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Discovery in Connection with Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by Smart City Holdings, LLC, Smart City Networks, L.P. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery conducted in this matter shall be governed by a protective order regarding the dissemination of confidential and highly confidential/attorneys eyes only information. The parties shall expeditiously submit a stipulated proposed protective order to the Court for approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/2/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
September 26, 2013 |
Filing
16
ORDER Granting 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order shall go into effect upon Plaintiffs' posting of a bond in the amount of $100.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be set by the Court upon the conclusion of the briefing on the motion, or as otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?