Bradford v. Baker
Petitioner: Julius Bradford
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Renee Baker
Case Number: 2:2013cv01784
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 SCHEDULING ORDER AS TO 144 ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing Prehearing motions due by 1/18/2021; Prehearing Briefs due 1/25/2021. See order for additional deadlines, instructions and detail. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified filed date on 11/19/2020 (DRS).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Setting Deadlines for 129 Evidentiary Hearing on November 3, 2020 at 9:30 AM by videoconference. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 127 Motion to Extend Time; Evidentiary Hearing reset for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7C by videoconference before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 117 Renewed Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. Counsel must meet and confer within 30 days of this order and file a Joint Proposed Pre-hearing Scheduling order as described. The Evidentiary Hearing is set by video-conference for 8/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 114 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Re: 98 Answer to 67 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Replies due by 8/7/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Granting 99 Motion to Extend Time to File Exhibits in Support of 98 Answer to Amended Habeas Petition. Deadline: 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting Respondents' 96 Motion to Extend Time Re: 67 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents' answer due 3/25/2019. Further extensions of time will not be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting 93 Third Motion to Extend Time Re: 67 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents' answer due 2/7/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting Respondents' 91 Motion to Extend Time Re: 67 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents' answer due 11/9/2018. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), the Clerk of the Court shall substitute William Gittere for Timothy Filson on the docket for this case as the respondent warden. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Denying Respondents' 73 Motion to Dismiss. Petitioner's 77 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing is Denied. Respondents shall file an Answer to the 67 Second Amended Petition within 90 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 83 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re: 73 Motion to Dismiss (Replies due by 2/15/2018); and Respond re 77 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing (Responses due by 2/15/2018). FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 13, 2017 (ECF No. 66 ) shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 81 Second Motion to Extend Time Re: 73 Motion to Dismiss. Respondents' Replies due by 2/8/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 78 Motion to Extend Time; ORDER granting 79 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 73 Motion to Dismiss, 77 Motion for Hearing., Replies for 73 due by 1/26/2018. Responses for 77 due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 74 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time (First Request) re 73 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/27/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER that 71 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. Respondents shall have until September 11, 2017, to answer or otherwise respond to the second amended habeas corpus petition in this action. FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 13, 2017 (ECF No. 66 ) shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 41 Motion to Stay and Abey. This action is STAYED while Petitioner exhausts in state court all his unexhausted claims for habeas corpus relief. On or before 6/15/2015 Petitioner shall file and serve a stat us report describing the status of his state court proceedings. Following the conclusion of Petitioner's state court proceedings Petitioner shall within 30 days make a motion to lift the stay. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that 44 FIRST MOTION to Extend Time re 22 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is GRANTED. Response is suspended pending resolution of 41 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting Respondents' 44 FIRST MOTION to Extend Time re 22 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents' response to the Petitioners 22 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is suspended pending resolution of Petitioner's 41 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF RECUSAL. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Gloria M. Navarro, Chief Judge, recuses herself in this action. This action is referred to the Clerk of Court for random reassignment. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying 3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Payment of filing fees due within 30 days. Granting 2 and 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Federal Public Defender's Office is appointed as counsel for petiti oner in place and stead of Attorney Lisa A Rasmussen. Amended Petition due within 150 days. Respondents' counsel shall enter a notice of appearance within 21 days. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/3/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: CJRA Coordinator - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford v. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julius Bradford
Represented By: Megan Hoffman
Represented By: Lisa A Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?