Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Vilsack et al
Plaintiff: |
Center for Biological Diversity, Maricopa Audubon Society and Dr. Robin Silver |
Defendant: |
Director Dan Ashe, Secretary Sally Jewell, Administrator Edward Knipling, Administrator Gregory Parham and Secretary Tom Vilsack |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv01785 |
Filed: |
September 30, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
16 U.S.C. § 1538 Endangered Species Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 5, 2019 |
Filing
120
ORDER Granting 119 Motion to Lift Stay of Case re 118 Order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
June 19, 2018 |
Filing
104
REMEDIAL ORDER. The Court AMENDS the judgment, and REMANDS this matter to Defendant United States Department of Agriculture ("USDA") and its sub-agency, Defendant Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service ("APHIS"). See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing
87
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 28 Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Maricopa Audubon Society, and Dr. Robin Silver's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgmen t in favor of the plaintiffs as to Claim Two. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 30 Defendants Tom Vilsack, Gregory Parham, Sally Jewell, and Dan Ashe's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of the defendants as to Claims One, Three, Four, and Five. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
July 13, 2016 |
Filing
62
ORDER Granting 61 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Attorney Julia Thrower terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 07/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
35
ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation. Responses due by 4/29/2015. Replies due by 6/4/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
March 2, 2015 |
Filing
33
ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation for Extension of Summary Judgment Briefing Deadlines. Responses due by 4/8/2015, Replies due by 5/14/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
September 9, 2014 |
Filing
22
ORDER Granting 20 Motion to Admit Government Attorneys Julia Thrower and John H Martin, III to Practice in the District of Nevada for Duration of Attorney's Employment and Special Show Cause to permit Appearance of Government Counsel Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?