Desert Sun Enterprises Limited v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 357 et al
Plaintiff: Desert Sun Enterprises Limited
Defendant: International Brotherhood Of Teamsters Local 631, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 357 and Southern Nevada Building and Construction Trades Council
Case Number: 2:2013cv01885
Filed: October 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 85 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Court's 12/16/2016 Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting 82 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Amy L Baker and Gregory E Smith terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 43 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/10/2014. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desert Sun Enterprises Limited v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 357 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Sun Enterprises Limited
Represented By: Amy L Baker
Represented By: Gregory E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood Of Teamsters Local 631
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 357
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Nevada Building and Construction Trades Council
Represented By: Paul More
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?