SATA GmbH & Co. KG v. Wenzhou T&E Industrial Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: SATA GmbH & Co. KG
Defendant: CMI Continental Marketing International Co. Ltd., Kuani Gear Co. Ltd. and Wenzhou T&E Industrial Co., Ltd.
Counter Claimant: Kuani Gear Co. Ltd.
Counter Defendant: SATA GmbH & Co. KG
Case Number: 2:2013cv02042
Filed: November 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER OF CONTEMPT that defendant Wenzhou T&E Industrial Co., Ltd. is in contempt for violating the 10/26/2016 Final Judgment. Defendant Wenzhou T&E Industrial Co., Ltd. is ordered to pay SATA $15,011,951.34. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 60 Motion to Destroy Counterfeit Goods. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction in favor of SATA GmbH & Co. KG and against Wenzhou T&E Industrial Co., Ltd. Plaintiff is awarded Statutory damages in the amount of $2,000,000, Attorneys fees in the amount of $10,177.83, and Costs in the amount of $901.49. The Clerk of the Court shall forthwith refund to SATA the $15,000 SATA initially placed on deposit with the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction in favor of SATA GmbH & Co. KG and against Wenzhou T&E Industrial Co., Ltd. Plaintiff is awarded Statutory damages in the amount of $2,000,000, Attorneys fees in the amount of $10,177. 83, and Costs in the amount of $901.49. The Clerk of the Court shall forthwith refund to SATA the $15,000 SATA initially placed on deposit with the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Finance - SLR)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 12 Defendant's Motion to Continue the Hearing on 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The 10 Temporary Restraining and Seizure Order entered on 11/6/2013 is hereby extended to 12/20/2013 at 5:00 p.m. Motion Hearing re 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is reset for 12/20/2013 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. The parties shall submit a Stipulated Order setting forth their proposed briefing schedule by 11/19/2013. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. SATA shall deposit with the Clerk of the Court the amount of $15,000.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Motion Hearing re 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 11/20/2013 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Responses due by 11/15/2013. Replies due by 11/19/2013. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/06/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SATA GmbH & Co. KG v. Wenzhou T&E Industrial Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMI Continental Marketing International Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuani Gear Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Alan C. Chen
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Represented By: John H. Gutke
Represented By: Patrick J. Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenzhou T&E Industrial Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Kuani Gear Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Alan C. Chen
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Represented By: John H. Gutke
Represented By: Patrick J. Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: SATA GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SATA GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?