King v. Calderwood et al
Plaintiff: Matthew J. King
Defendant: CCS1 Amy Calderwood, Director James G. Cox, CCS2 Roland Daniels, CCS3 Duane Graham, CCS3 Cary Leavitt, Associate Warden Jennifer Nash, CCS1 Chad Smith and CCS3 James Larry Wuest
Case Number: 2:2013cv02080
Filed: November 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting 94 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants Motion to Extend Time 95 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Prison Work Limit 119 and Motion for Order Granting Motion to Extend Prison Work Limit 125 are DENIED as moot. Pla intiffs Motion to Withdraw Motion for Reinstatement of Defendant Amy Calderwood 122 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion for Reinstatement 120 is hereby WITHDRAWN.The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 87 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Response to discovery requests due by 12/8/15. 98 Motion to Extend Prison Copywork Limit is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Denying 79 Motion for Appointment of Independent Investigator and Denying 97 Motion for Service of Subpoenas Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Denying 72 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting 88 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Extend Time. The deadlines in the 42 Scheduling Order are extended 45 days: Discovery due by 7/6/2015. Motions due by 8/5/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/4/2015. The Motions to Strike 69 , 70 , and 71 are GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall STRIKE 60 Motion, 61 Interrogatories, and 62 Request from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. 47 Motion for Reconsideration of Plaintiffs Request to Extend Legal Copy Work Limit is GRANTED. Plaintiffs copy work limit shall be increased $25.00 to a total of $125.00. 57 Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED thus 49 Motion for the Court to set a Briefing Schedule is deemed WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that 29 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment 29 filed by Defendants Jennifer Nash, CCSIII Leavitt, CCSIII Graham, CCSIII Wuest, Roland Daniels , CCS Smith, and Amy Calderwood ("HDSP Defendants") is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims against HDSP Defendants are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment 29 filed by Defendants James G. Cox and Quentin Byrne ("NDOC Defendants") is DENIED, and Plaintiffs claims against the NDOC Defendants are not dismissed. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants Jennifer Nash, CCSIII Leavitt, CCSIII Graham, CCSIII Wuest, Roland Daniels, CCS Smith, and Amy Calderwood ("HDSP Defendants"). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that 20 Motion to Serve is DENIED AS MOOT. Duane Graham answer due 2/19/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 26 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Medical Records Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Clerk electronically serve a copy of this order and a copy of 7 Complaint on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Within 21 days of the date of entry of this order, the Attorney General& #039;s Office shall file a notice re service. If the Attorney General accepts service of process for any named defendant(s), such defendant(s) shall file and serve an answer or other response to the complaint within sixty (60) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Kat Howe - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Calderwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS1 Amy Calderwood
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director James G. Cox
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS2 Roland Daniels
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS3 Duane Graham
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS3 Cary Leavitt
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Warden Jennifer Nash
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS1 Chad Smith
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCS3 James Larry Wuest
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?