Montilla v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Montilla
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02348
Filed: December 27, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 16, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 31 Motion to Exclude is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Ms. Montilla's medical damages are limited to $52,565.95. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 10, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court RECUSAL ORDER. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Carl W. Hoffman recuses himself in this action. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action shall be referred to the Clerk of Court for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing set on 9/15/15 41 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
August 6, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 19 Motion to Extend Time. Granting 20 Stipulation to take depositions outside of the close of Discovery and for Plaintiff to disclose a rebuttal expert. Dispositive Motions due by 11/7/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/8/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montilla v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Montilla
Represented By: Sarah M Banda
Represented By: Jerome R. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda H Entzminger
Represented By: Daniela LaBounty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?